EP2008221 - VERSATILE AUTHENTICITY INVESTIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trackway OY Salomonkatu 17B 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROKAHR, Ingrid Hästberget S-68492 Munkfors / SE | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Oy ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Oy Mechelininkatu 1 a FIN-00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06824634.7 | 12.12.2006 | [2009/01] | WO2006SE50576 | Priority number, date | US20060787387P | 29.03.2006 Original published format: US 787387 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007111548 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008221 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K9/46 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G06K19/14 (EP);
G07D7/0043 (EP);
G07D7/0047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIELSEITIGE AUTHENTIZITÄTSUNTERSUCHUNG | [2009/01] | English: | VERSATILE AUTHENTICITY INVESTIGATION | [2009/01] | French: | ETUDE POLYVALENTE D'AUTHENTICITE | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/01] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003006170 (LAWANDY NABIL M [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0032] - [0059] - [0065] *[I] 5-7,13,14; | [XI]WO2004107278 (ASTROSYS INTERNAT LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,15 * the whole document * [I] 5-7,13,14 | International search | [Y]WO0143086 (MISCHENKO VALENTIN ALEXANDROVI [BY], et al); | [X]US6459825 (LIPPINCOTT PHILLIPS M [US]); | [X]WO2005088533 (INGENIA TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) |