EP1927221 - AUTONOMOUS ROUTING OF NETWORK MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compressus, Inc. 101 Constitution Avenue N.W., Suite 800 Washington, DC 20001 / US | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNANDEZ, Albert, A. 12835 Crawford Drive Tustin CA 92782 / US | 02 /
MULOPULOS, George, P. 67 Princeville Lane Las Vegas NV 89113 / US | 03 /
COOPER, Gregory 9931 Deerhaven Drive Santa Ana CA 92705 / US | 04 /
GASZTONYL, Laszlo, R. 9400 Ravina Court Fairfax Station VA 22039 / US | [2013/45] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
HERNANDEZ, Albert, A. 12835 Crawford Drive Tustin CA 92782 / US | ||
02 /
MULOPULOS, George, P. 67 Princeville Lane Las Vegas NV 89113 / US | |||
03 /
COOPER, Gregory 9931 Deerhaven Drive Santa Ana CA 92705 / US | |||
04 /
GASZTONYL, Laszlo, R. 9400 Ravina Court Fairfax Station VA 22039 / US | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06825047.1 | 21.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US36772 | Priority number, date | US20050233775 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: US 233775 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007038185 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927221 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927221 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06Q10/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2008 | BA | 31.03.2008 | HR | 31.03.2008 | MK | 31.03.2008 | RS | 31.03.2008 | Title | German: | AUTONOMES ROUTEN VON NETZWERK-NACHRICHTEN | [2008/23] | English: | AUTONOMOUS ROUTING OF NETWORK MESSAGES | [2008/23] | French: | ACHEMINEMENT AUTONOME DE MESSAGES RESEAU | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 24.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2014
06.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Schretter, Nikola Siemens AG CT IP Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2014/37] | 01.04.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.07.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/11] | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2006 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BE | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CH | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | IT | 06.11.2013 | LI | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | IE | 21.09.2014 | LU | 21.09.2014 | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.09.2006 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.09.2006 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
IE | 21.09.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2392519 (TERANET ENTPR INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004054744 (KARAMCHEDU MURALI M [US], et al) [A] 1-38* page 1 - page 5 *; | [XY]WO2005060157 (SOLACE SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,20 * page 1 - page 6 * [Y] 2-19,21-38; | [Y]US2005203771 (ACHAN PRADEEP P [US]) [Y] 2-19,21-38 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2005152286 (BETTS CRAIG [US], et al); | [X]US2005203771 (ACHAN PRADEEP P [US]); | [X] - CARZANIGA ET AL., "A Routing Scheme for Content-Based Networking", DEPARTMENT OF COMPUTER SCIENCE, UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO, (200306), XP008095557 | [A] - CARZANIGA ET AL., "Content-Based Addressing and Routing: A General Method and its Application", DEPARTMENT OF COMPUTER SCIENCE, UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO, (200001), URL: http://www.doc.ic.ac.uk/~alw/doc/papers/techreports/CU-CS-902-00.pdf, XP008095558 |