EP1928498 - METHODS TO TREAT T-CELL DISORDERS USING TISF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S-Cell Biosciences, Inc. 41718 Eastman Drive Murrieta, CA 92562 / US | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARDSLEY, Terry Raymond c/o President and CEO, S-Cell Biosciences, Inc. 41718 Eastman Drive Murietta, CA 92562 / US | [2009/39] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
BEARDSLEY, Terry Raymond 32547 Mesa Lilac Rd. Escondido, CA 92026 / US | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Hatzmann, Martin VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06825240.2 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US38028 | Priority number, date | US20050722847P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 722847 P | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007041279 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1928498 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | A61K45/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON T-ZELL-STÖRUNGEN MIT TISF | [2008/24] | English: | METHODS TO TREAT T-CELL DISORDERS USING TISF | [2008/24] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DES LYMPHOCYTES T AU MOYEN DE TISF | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 05.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2008 | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2010 | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005025594 (CELL BIOSCIENCES INC S [US], et al) [X] 1,7-10,12-14,19-21,27-31 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - line 67 * * column 3, line 21 - line 39 * * column 4, line 45 - line 57 *; | [T]US2007087968 (BEARDSLEY TERRY RAYMOND [US]) [T] 1-31 * claims 1-24 *; | [A] - STRAYER D S ET AL, "Immunosuppression in viral oncogenesis. III. Effects of virus infection on interleukin 1 and interleukin 2 generation and responsiveness.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 DEC 1986, (19861201), vol. 137, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3632 - 3638, XP002530528 [A] 1-31 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5616554 (BEARDSLEY TERRY R [US]); | [Y]US2002086049 (BOLTON ANTHONY E [GB], et al) |