EP1932000 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRESS SIGNATURE TRACKING AND DATA ASSOCIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Americas, Inc. 121 Broadway Street Dover, NH 03820-3290 / US | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANCOURT, Michael Raymond 60 Pearson Road Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 02 /
HOFF, Howie 63 Jenkins Lane Lee, NH 03824 / US | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/25] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06825322.8 | 03.10.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006US38376 | Priority number, date | US20050243657 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: US 243657 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007044291 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1932000 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1932000 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F33/02, B41F33/16, B41F13/02, G07C3/14, B65H23/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
G07C3/146 (EP,US);
B41F13/02 (EP,US);
B41F33/0009 (EP,US);
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
B41F33/02 (EP,US);
B41F33/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | B41F33/00, B41F33/02, B41F33/16, G07C3/14, B41F13/02, B65H23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/25] | G01N37/00, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/44] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRESSENSIGNATURVERFOLGUNG UND DATENASSOZIATION | [2008/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRESS SIGNATURE TRACKING AND DATA ASSOCIATION | [2008/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI DE SIGNATURE DE PRESSE ET D' ASSOCIATION DE DONNÉES | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 15.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 12.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/50] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | CH DE FR GB | ||
Date: | 12.10.2009 | ||
[2012/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6112658 (GUNTHER WILLIAM G [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * figures 1,4 * * column 4, lines 17-60 * * column 11, lines 1-37 *; | [A]US6377247 (HALVERSON THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]US2006196936 (CHRISTOFFERSON DAVID F [US], et al); | [A]US6181439 (BRONSTEIN RAFAIL [IL], et al); | [A]US6721061 (ALLEN ROY D [US]); | [A]US6441914 (BARAK PALTIEL [IL], et al); | [A]US6377247 (HALVERSON THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US2002097407 (RYAN DONALD R [US], et al); | [A]US6112658 (GUNTHER WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [A]US5398289 (ROURKE JOHN L [US], et al) |