EP1945503 - SWASHPLATE ANTI-TORQUE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation 6900 Main Street, Mailstop S316A, P.O. Box 9729 Stratford, CT 06615-9129 / US | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABRERA, Pedro, L. 23 Sorensen Rd. West Haven, CT 06516 / US | 02 /
POULIN, Stephen, V. 533 Popes Island Rd. Milford, CT 06461 / US | 03 /
FEDERICI, Francis, D. 80 Nancy Drive Bridgeport, CT 06604 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Waibel, Stefan Christopher Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Waibel, Stefan Christopher Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstraße 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06825430.9 | 03.10.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US38734 | Priority number, date | US20050724036P | 05.10.2005 Original published format: US 724036 P | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007044374 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1945503 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1945503 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/10, B64C27/605 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
B64C27/10 (EP,US);
B64C27/605 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | B64C27/35 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/49] |
Former [2008/44] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TAUMELSCHEIBENGEGENDREHMOMENTMECHANISMUS | [2008/30] | English: | SWASHPLATE ANTI-TORQUE MECHANISM | [2008/30] | French: | MECANISME ANTICOUPLE DE PLATEAU CYCLIQUE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 06.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3274897 (REINKE DONALD B); | [X]US4630998 (LEMAN JEAN-LUC [FR], et al); | [A]US4714450 (BYRNES FRANCIS E [US], et al); | [XI]US4804352 (SCHMIDT WARREN E [US]); | [XI]GB2308112 (EUROCOPTER DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) | International search | [X]US3274897 (REINKE DONALD B); | [X]US3782854 (RYBICKI R); | [X]US3967918 (MOUILLE RENE LOUIS, et al); | [A]US4297078 (MARTIN ALFRED C); | [X]US5507627 (OKAZAKI MICHIO [JP]) | by applicant | US3274897 | US4630998 | US4804352 | GB2308112 |