EP1948725 - SLUMP RETENTION IN CEMENTITIOUS COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GCP Applied Technologies Inc. 62 Whittemore Avenue Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 7500 Grace Drive Columbia, MD 21044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEKNAVORIAN, Ara, A. 4 Percheron Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | 02 /
KOYATA, Hideo 6-3-402,Higashi-cho, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa Japan 243-0001 / JP | 03 /
MCGUIRE, Darrick, B. 98 Mary St. Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 04 /
JOVANOVIC, Ivana 277 Beacon Street, Apt. 4B Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
JEKNAVORIAN, Ara, A. 4 Percheron Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | ||
02 /
KOYATA, Hideo 779-1, APT. 806 Sanda, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0211 / JP | |||
03 /
MCGUIRE, Darrick, B. 98 Mary St. Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
04 /
JOVANOVIC, Ivana 204 Beacon Street, Apt. 2F Boston, MA 02116 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06825871.4 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US39991 | Priority number, date | US20050726540P | 14.10.2005 Original published format: US 726540 P | US20050729712P | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 729712 P | US20060765021P | 03.02.2006 Original published format: US 765021 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007047407 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1948725 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C08L33/04 (KR);
C04B40/0039 (EP,US);
C08K3/00 (KR);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08K9/02 (KR);
C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C04B2103/308 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
C08L61/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B22/085, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2647, C04B24/38 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B22/16, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2647, C04B24/38 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B24/06, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2647, C04B24/38 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B24/16, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2647, C04B24/38 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B24/226, C04B2103/308, C04B2103/308, C04B2103/44 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/2647, C04B24/2647, C04B24/38 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | AUSBREITMASSRETENTION IN ZEMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/31] | English: | SLUMP RETENTION IN CEMENTITIOUS COMPOSITIONS | [2008/31] | French: | RETENUE D'AFFAISSEMENT DANS DES COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE CIMENT | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/22] | 24.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2019 | 27.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1344754 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] , [0055] , [0057] * * tables 2,3,7 * [I] 7,8; | [X]US2003199616 (YAMASHITA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples 45-48 * * examples 53,54,57,58 *; | [XI]WO2004087602 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0039] - [0050] * [I] 6; | [X]WO2005044752 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * pages 2-64 *; | [A] - GONCALVES A ET AL, "Comparative study of influence of superplasticizers and superplasticizer/plasticizer blends on slump-loss", AMERICAN CONCRETE INSTITUTE. PUBLICATION SP, AMERICAN CONCRETE INSTITUTE, US, (20000101), vol. SP195-20, ISSN 0193-2527, pages 321 - 333, XP008115367 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6527850 (SCHWARTZ STEVEN A [US], et al) |