EP1951367 - PROVIDING MULTIPLE SIGNAL MODES FOR A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cyberonics, Inc. 100 Cyberonics Boulevard Houston TX 77058-9798 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMSTRONG, Randolph, K. 16807 Glenshannon Houston, TX 77059 / US | 02 /
PARNIS, Steven, M. 3110 Edgewood Drive Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 03 /
SCOTT, Timothy, L. 16931 Ascot Meadow Drive Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06826012.4 | 16.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US40328 | Priority number, date | US20050260951 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 260951 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007053288 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951367 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
A61N1/36146 (EP,US);
A61N1/36082 (EP,US);
A61N1/36167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON MULTIPLEN SIGNAL-MODI FÜR EIN MEDIZINPRODUKT | [2008/32] | English: | PROVIDING MULTIPLE SIGNAL MODES FOR A MEDICAL DEVICE | [2008/32] | French: | MULTIPLES MODES DE STIMULATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6690974 (ARCHER STEPHEN T [US], et al) [X] 22 * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 55 * * column 9, line 41 - column 11, line 65 * * column 19, line 36 - column 20, line 67 * * figures 1-11,22 *; | [X]US6944501 (PLESS BENJAMIN D [US]) [X] 22 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 50 * * figures 1A-4C,7A-7E *; | [X]US4949721 (TORIU MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 22 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 37 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 65 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US2005154425 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US], et al) [A] 22 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0074] - [0084] - [0093] , [0094] , [0109] - [0119]; figures 1,12A,12B *; | [PA]US2006173493 (ARMSTRONG RANDOLPH K [US], et al) [PA] 22 * paragraphs [0036] - [0060]; figures 1A-8 *; | [E]US2007027486 (ARMSTRONG RANDOLPH K [US]) [E] 22 * paragraphs [0089] - [0133]; figures 1-5 * |