EP1951808 - PERFLUOROELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS FOR LOW TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Performance Elastomers L.L.C. 300 Bellevue Parkway Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISH, Christopher, John 112 Quail Lane Kennett Square, Pennsylvania 19348 / US | 02 /
COUGHLIN, Michael, Cregg 1401 Trevalley Road Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06826556.0 | 25.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US41468 | Priority number, date | US20050257539 | 25.10.2005 Original published format: US 257539 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007050600 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951808 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951808 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/18, C08L71/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US);
C08G2650/48 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/18, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L71/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/48] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERFLUORELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR TIEFTEMPERATURANWENDUNGEN | [2008/32] | English: | PERFLUOROELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS FOR LOW TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS | [2008/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE PERFLUOROELASTOMERES POUR APPLICATIONS A BASSES TEMPERATURES | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 27.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4413094 (AUFDERMARSH JR CARL A [US]) [A] 1-8* example -; claim - *; | [DA]US5268405 (OJAKAAR LEO [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US5789489 (COUGHLIN MICHAEL CREGG [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * examples 4,5; tables IV-V * |