EP1951351 - WIRE GUIDE HAVING DISTAL COUPLING TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Incorporated 750 North Daniel's Way, P.O. Box 489 Bloomington, Indiana 47402-0489 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELSHEIMER, Jeffry, S. RR1, BOX 1642 Springville, IN 47462 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Garratt, Peter Douglas Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06826986.9 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US42184 | Priority number, date | US20050730776P | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 730776 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007050977 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1951351 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951351 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09, A61M25/01 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M25/0905 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09175 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHT MIT DISTALER KOPPLUNGSSPITZE | [2009/18] | English: | WIRE GUIDE HAVING DISTAL COUPLING TIP | [2008/32] | French: | FIL-GUIDE COMPORTANT UNE EXTREMITE DISTALE DE COUPLAGE | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/32] | FÜHRUNGSDRAHT MIT DISTALER KUPPLUNGSSPITZE | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 22.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | LT | 30.09.2009 | LV | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | LU | 26.10.2009 | BG | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | IS | 30.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
IS | 30.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/15] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
LT | 30.09.2009 | ||
LV | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0436303 (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 4 - column 1, line 7 * * column 2, line 15 - column 2, line 47 * * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 13; figures 1A,1B,2; claims 1-3 * * column 9, line 12 - column 9, line 22 *; | [A]US5267958 (BUCHBINDER MAURICE [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 11 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 6; figure 2 ** column 3, line 55 - column 3, line 65; figure 7; claim 1 *; | [A]US5306261 (ALLIGER HOWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 28 - column 2, line 64 * * column 4, line 22 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 12; figure 3 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 10; figures 6,7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO02094364 (KENSEY NASH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 7 - page 1, line 10 * * page 10, line 31 - page 12, line 7; figures 5,6 * |