EP1954792 - SOLVENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING UNSATURATED FLUORINATED HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAPPA, Mario, Joseph 3 Oakridge Court Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
SCHWEITZER, Melodie, A. 1821 Braken Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 03 /
SIEVERT, Allen, Capron 215 Rhett Lane Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US | 04 /
SWEARINGEN, Ekaterina, N. 1302 North Rodney Street Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06827266.5 | 01.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006US42633 | Priority number, date | US20050732771P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732771 P | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007053672 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1954792 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/24, C11D7/50, C07C21/18, C10M107/38, C23G5/028 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
C08J9/146 (EP,US);
C11D3/24 (KR);
C03C23/0075 (EP,US);
C07C21/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4208 (EP,US);
C08G18/4883 (EP,US);
C08J9/0019 (US);
C08J9/144 (EP,US);
C09K23/017 (US);
C10M105/52 (EP,US);
C10M107/38 (EP,US);
C10M147/04 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M177/00 (EP,US);
C11D3/245 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D7/50 (KR);
C11D7/5018 (EP,US);
C23G5/028 (KR);
C23G5/02803 (EP,US);
C23G5/02825 (EP,US);
G11B23/505 (EP,US);
G11B5/7253 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/8408 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08J2205/05 (EP,US);
C08J2205/052 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
C08J2375/06 (US);
C08J2375/08 (US);
C10M2211/022 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/04 (EP,US);
C10M2213/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/22 (EP,US);
C10N2040/14 (EP,US);
C10N2040/18 (EP,US);
C10N2050/02 (EP,US);
C10N2070/00 (EP,US);
C11D2111/14 (EP,US);
C11D2111/16 (EP,US);
C11D2111/18 (EP,US);
C11D2111/22 (EP,US);
G11B5/71 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT UNGESÄTTIGTEN FLUORKOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | [2008/33] | English: | SOLVENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING UNSATURATED FLUORINATED HYDROCARBONS | [2008/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOLVANTS COMPRENANT DES HYDROCARBURES FLUORES INSATURES | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/09] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4613708 (RIESS JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 28-30 * examples 1-3 *; | [A]EP0350316 (ISC CHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-30 * page 2, lines 34-48 ** claim - *; | [A]WO9423008 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-30 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 29 * * page 4, lines 29-34 * * page 5, lines 27-34 * * page 6, lines 4-14 * * page 10, lines 1-16 * * claims 1,6,7,9 *; | [A]EP0731162 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-30 * page 2, lines 21-26 * * example -; claims 1,3 *; | [X] - PEDLER A. E. ET AL., "THE SYNTHESIS AND DEHYDROFLUORINATION OF SOME POLYFLUOROALKANES", J. FLUORINE CHEM., (1972), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 337 - 345, XP002427764 [X] 28-30 * page 341 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(00)83231-5 | [X] - SANTINI G. ET AL., "THE REACTION OF PERFLUOROALKYLCOPPER COMPOUNDS WITH 1-BROMO-PERFLUOROALKYLETHYLENES", TETRAHEDRON, (1973), vol. 29, pages 2411 - 2414, XP002427778 [X] 28-30 * table 3; compound 2A 2B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)93371-X | [X] - DEVALLEZ BERNARD ET AL, "SOLUBILITY OF RESPIRATORY GASES IN THE 1,2-BIS(F-ALKYL) ETHENES", JOURNAL DE CHIMIE PHYSIQUE, SOCIETE DE CHIMIE PHYSIQUE, PARIS, FR, (1988), vol. 85, no. 10, ISSN 0021-7689, pages 947 - 952, XP008077143 [X] 28-30 * table I; compounds F-24E, F-I3I3E, F-I34E, F-26E, F-44E, F-45E * | [X] - LE BLANC M ET AL, "A STRATEGY FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF PURE, INERT PERFLUOROALKYLATED DERIVATIVES DESIGNED FOR BLOOD SUBSTITUTION", OXYGEN CARRYING COLLOIDAL BLOOD SUBSTITUTES. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM PERFLUOROCHEM. BLOOD SUBSTITUTES, (1982), pages 43 - 49, XP008077176 [X] 28-30 * page 45 - page 46 * * figure 4; table I * |