EP1949691 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR AN INTEGRATED MEDIA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 2Wire, Inc. 1704 Automation Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMANO, Pasquale 16439 Bonnie Lane Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
HIMAN, Brian, L. 14 Glen Ridge Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 03 /
SUGAR, Brian 2820 Franklin Street, 2 San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06827421.6 | 02.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US42899 | Priority number, date | US20050268990 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 268990 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007056108 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1949691 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H04N5/782 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/434 (EP,US);
H04N21/4381 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4828 (EP,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US);
H04N21/8113 (EP,US);
H04N21/8153 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR EINE INTEGRIERTE MEDIA-EINRICHTUNG | [2008/31] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR AN INTEGRATED MEDIA DEVICE | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREILS DESTINES A UN DISPOSITIF MULTIMEDIA INTEGRE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 05.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 17.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003120742 (OHGAMI YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 24-29 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0027] - [0053] - [0071] *; | [X]EP1420587 (THOMSON BROADBAND UK LTD [GB]) [X] 24-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0010] - [0016] * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1117214 (TERAYON COMM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 24-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0040] - [0050] - [0091] - [0098] - [0128] - [0150] - [0170] - [0180] - [0183] - [0190] * * figure 3 *; | [X]US6263503 (MARGULIS NEAL [US]) [X] 24-29 * abstract * * figures 1,8,9 * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 21 * | International search | [X]US2005108769 (ARNOLD MATT [US], et al) |