EP1955159 - LOG COLLECTION, STRUCTURING AND PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logrhythm, Inc. 3005 Center Green Drive, Suite 130 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLELLA, Phillip 3335 Talisman Court, Apt. C Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
PETERSEN, Christopher 3335 TALISMAN COURT, APT. C Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
VILLELLA, Phillip 33335 TALISMAN COURT, APT. C Boulder, CO 80301 / US | ||
02 /
PETERSEN, Christopher 3335 TALISMAN COURT, APT. C Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/38] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06827773.0 | 13.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006US44044 | Priority number, date | US20050735482P | 12.11.2005 Original published format: US 735482 P | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007059057 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955159 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955159 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/22, G06F21/00, H04L12/26, H04L12/24, G06F11/34 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G06F11/0727 (EP);
G06F11/2257 (EP);
G06F11/3476 (EP);
G06F21/552 (EP);
H04L41/069 (EP);
H04L43/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | G06F11/34 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | G06F7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/33] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | PROTOKOLLIERUNGSSAMMLUNG, -STRUKTURIERUNG UND VERARBEITUNG | [2008/33] | English: | LOG COLLECTION, STRUCTURING AND PROCESSING | [2008/33] | French: | COLLECTE, STRUCTURATION ET TRAITEMENT DE JOURNAUX | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2006 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | IT | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | ES | 15.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | LU | 13.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
LU | 13.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004039809 (RANOUS ALEXANDER CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0036] , [0078]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004254919 (GIUSEPPINI GABRIELE [US]) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [X]US2005049924 (DEBETTENCOURT JASON [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 4,9 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0060] , [0061] , [0091] , [0092] , [0099] , [0107] , [0142] , [0154] , [0273] - [0282] *; | [X]US2005114508 (DESTEFANO JASON M [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 2,3,5 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] - [0027] - [0056] - [0072] * | International search | [Y]US2002138762 (HORNE DONALD R [CA]); | [Y]US2003120663 (VINING BONNIE JEAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2003235190 (JOSYULA RAVI [US], et al); | [X]US2004039827 (THOMAS CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005049924 |