EP1961060 - HYBRID THIN-FILM BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sapurast Research LLC 1209 Orange Street Corporation Trust Center Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Infinite Power Solutions, Inc. 11149 Bradford Road Littleton, CO 80127 / US | ||
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Infinite Power Solutions, Inc. 14998 West 6h Avenue, Bldg. E, Suite 60 Golden, CO 80401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUDECKER, Bernd, J. 8 Blue Cedar Littleton, CO 80127 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Shawn, W. 14083 West 22ND Avenue Golden, CO 80401 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06827875.3 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US44827 | Priority number, date | US20050737613P | 17.11.2005 Original published format: US 737613 P | US20060759479P | 17.01.2006 Original published format: US 759479 P | US20060782792P | 16.03.2006 Original published format: US 782792 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007061928 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961060 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961060 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/82, H01M4/62, H01M6/40 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H01M10/0562 (EP);
H01M10/38 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M4/02 (KR);
H01M4/04 (KR);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP);
H01M4/48 (KR);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP);
H01M6/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | H01M4/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRID-DÜNNFILMBATTERIE | [2008/35] | English: | HYBRID THIN-FILM BATTERY | [2008/35] | French: | BATTERIE HYBRIDE EN COUCHE MINE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 24.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2006 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004106046 (INDA YASUSHI [JP]) [X] 1-9,13,16-18,21-23,28,31-33,41,46,49-51 * examples 1,3 *; | [X]US2004048157 (NEUDECKER BERND J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,13,16,19,21-23,28,30-33,41,46,49,51 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0092] , [0120] - [0123] * | International search | [X]US5569520 (BATES JOHN B [US]); | [Y]US6664006 (MUNSHI M ZAFAR A [US]); | [Y]US6168884 (NEUDECKER BERND J [US], et al); | [Y]US5612153 (MOULTON RUSSELL D [US], et al) | Examination | US5741406 | by applicant | US2004106046 | US2004048157 | US5741406 |