EP1963653 - MULTIPART PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/25] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSMER, Dieter Rastatter Weg 2 71686 Remseck / DE | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Pohle, Reinhard Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Pohle, Reinhard Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Pohle, Reinhard Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46 D-70376 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06828704.4 | 20.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006DE02274 | Priority number, date | DE20051061899 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061899 | [2008/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007076821 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963653 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963653 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F02F3/0023 (EP,US);
F02F3/00 (KR);
F16J1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRTEILIGER KOLBEN FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2008/36] | English: | MULTIPART PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2008/36] | French: | PISTON EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.06.2010 | ES | 04.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/18] | IT | 23.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE281030 (PAUL DANIEL) [A] 4 * page 1, lines 54-59; figure . *; | [XA]EP0469666 (BORGO NOVA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 1; figure 1 * [A] 6; | [A]FR2681643 (MAHLE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [AD]DE10257022 (MAHLE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0010]; figure . * |