EP1963669 - WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE COMPRISING A TRAILING EDGE SECTION OF CONSTANT CROSS SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2013/42] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states LM GLASFIBER A/S Rolles Moellevej 1 6640 Lunderskov / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRABAU, Peter H.C. Petersens Vej 10 DK-6000 Kolding / DK | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Hussey, Paul Anthony, et al LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | ||
Former [2012/08] | Kitchen, Steven Richard, et al LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | ||
Former [2010/27] | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2008/36] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S, Aaboulevarden 17 8100 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 06828753.1 | 20.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006DK00731 | Priority number, date | DK20050001800 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: DK 200501800 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007071249 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963669 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F03D1/0641 (EP,US);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F05B2240/301 (EP,US);
F05B2240/311 (EP,US);
F05B2280/4004 (EP,US);
F05C2225/02 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENROTORBLATT MIT EINEM EINEN KONSTANTEN QUERSCHNITT AUFWEISENDEN ABSTRÖMKANTENABSCHNITT | [2008/36] | English: | WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE COMPRISING A TRAILING EDGE SECTION OF CONSTANT CROSS SECTION | [2008/36] | French: | LAME DE ROTOR DE TURBINE A VENT COMPRENANT UNE SECTION DE BORD TRAINANT DE SECTION TRANSVERSALE CONSTANTE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/44] | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DK9500009U (HENRIK STIESDAL BONUS ENERGY A [DK]) [X] 1,5-11,14-16,1,5-11,14-16,1,5-11,14-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [X]WO9519500 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9-11,14-16,1,2,5,7,9-11,14-16,1,2,5,7,9-11,14-16 * page 4, lines 1-35; figures 3-5 * * page 4, lines 1-35; figures 3-5 * * page 4, lines 1-35; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO0014405 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,13-16,1,2,7-9,13-16,1,2,7-9,13-16 * page 3, lines 14-20; figure 2 * * page 3, lines 14-20; figure 2 * * page 3, lines 14-20; figure 2 *; | [X]DE4132453 (FRITZ JOHANN PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,12,14-16,1,2,7,8,10,12,14-16,1,2,7,8,10,12,14-16 * column 2, lines 2-35; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 2-35; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 2-35; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19647102 (ARRIBI PHILIPPE [ES]) [X] 1,2,5,7-11,14-16,1,2,5,7-11,14-16,1,2,5,7-11,14-16 * column 1, lines 12-16 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 14 * * column 10, lines 27-56; figures 1-6 * * column 1, lines 12-16 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 14 * * column 10, lines 27-56; figures 1-6 * * column 1, lines 12-16 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 14 * * column 10, lines 27-56; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP1524431 (NATENCO NATURAL ENERGY CORP GM [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,12,14-16,1,2,5-7,10,12,14-16,1,2,5-7,10,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] , [0020]; figures 1,2,5,6 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] , [0020]; figures 1,2,5,6 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] , [0020]; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]US4408958 (SCHACLE CHARLES V [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,14-16,1,2,5,7,8,14-16,1,2,5,7,8,14-16 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 39; figure 2 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 39; figure 2 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 39; figure 2 *; | [X]US3042371 (FANTI ROY A) [X] 1,2,7-11,15,16,1,2,7-11,15,16,1,2,7-11,15,16 * column 2, lines 17-36 * * column 3, lines 3-36; figures 6-15 * * column 2, lines 17-36 * * column 3, lines 3-36; figures 6-15 * * column 2, lines 17-36 * * column 3, lines 3-36; figures 6-15 *; | [X]US5320491 (COLEMAN CLINT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,12,14-16,1,2,7-9,12,14-16,1,2,7-9,12,14-16 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 36; figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 36; figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 36; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2441151 (JONES ROBERT T) [X] 1,2,5,7,15,16,1,2,5,7,15,16,1,2,5,7,15,16 * column 3, lines 38-74 * * column 5, lines 1-51; figures 1,10-12 * * column 3, lines 38-74 * * column 5, lines 1-51; figures 1,10-12 * * column 3, lines 38-74 * * column 5, lines 1-51; figures 1,10-12 *; | [X]US2450440 (MILLS ROSCOE H) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10,11,15,16,1,2,5,7,8,10,11,15,16,1,2,5,7,8,10,11,15,16 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-10 * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-10 * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE10021850 (FROMMANN OLAF [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-12,14-16,1,2,5-12,14-16,1,2,5-12,14-16 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 3,6; claims 1,3 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 3,6; claims 1,3 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 3,6; claims 1,3 *; | [X]DE19741490 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-10,15,16,1,2,7-10,15,16,1,2,7-10,15,16 * column 4, lines 1-51; figures 1,2 * * column 4, lines 1-51; figures 1,2 * * column 4, lines 1-51; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2004088130 (FORSKNINGSCT RISOE [DK], et al) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 5 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 5 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 5 *; | [A]US4618313 (MOSIEWICZ ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * figures 3-5,8,9 * * figures 3-5,8,9 * * figures 3-5,8,9 * | Examination | US4976587 | EP1338793 |