EP1943426 - DEVICE FOR FASTENING AN ATTACHMENT TO A SUPPORT PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. RAYMOND ET CIE 115 Cours Berriat 38019 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPITZ, Uwe Eichseler Strasse 1 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Rüttgers, Joachim A. Raymond GmbH & Co. KG Teichstrasse 57 79539 Lörrach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Rüttgers, Joachim A. Raymond GmbH & Co. KG Teichstrasse 57 79539 Lörrach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06828827.3 | 18.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP10025 | Priority number, date | DE20051051678 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005051678 | [2008/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048530 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943426 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943426 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/06, B60N3/02, B60R13/02 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B60N3/026 (EP,US);
F16B19/1081 (EP,US);
B60R13/0206 (EP,US);
F16B2200/509 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7062 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES ANBAUTEILES AN EINEM TRÄGERTEIL | [2008/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR FASTENING AN ATTACHMENT TO A SUPPORT PART | [2008/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN COMPOSANT SUR UNE PIECE DE SUPPORT | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 30.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IE | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | LV | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | AT | 18.10.2009 | LU | 18.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
AT | 18.10.2009 | ||
LU | 18.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
AT | 18.10.2009 | ||
LU | 18.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
AT | 18.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE4309024 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [Y] 7 * abstract *[A] 1,4,5; | [XAY]EP0743461 (ELTA PLASTICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, paragraph 28; figures 1-3 * [A] 3 [Y] 7; | [A]EP0967136 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * |