EP1963058 - ELECTRIC RAZOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÜRST, Stefan Ernst-Moritz-Arndt-Str. 3a 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2008/36] | Application number, filing date | 06828876.0 | 27.10.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006EP10359 | Priority number, date | DE20051062178 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005062178 | [2008/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007079804 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963058 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963058 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/40 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B26B19/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENES RASIERGERÄT | [2008/36] | English: | ELECTRIC RAZOR | [2008/36] | French: | RASOIR ELECTRIQUE | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 26.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | LU | 27.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
LU | 27.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
LU | 27.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
LU | 27.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 31.03.2010 | |
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2613975 (KUSTER RENE [FR], et al) [A] 1-4,7-12 * page 4 *; | [A]DE10217986 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004108368 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0018] - [0022] - [0034] - [0036] *; | [A]DE102004023558 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] - [0026]; figures 1,2 * |