EP2101840 - CARDIOCIRCULATORY AIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azzolina, Gaetano Loc. Pontebosio 5 54016 Licciana Nardi / IT | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | D'Agostini, Giovanni D'Agostini Organizzazione S.r.l. Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | D'Agostini, Giovanni D'AGOSTINI ORGANIZZAZIONE SRL, Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [2009/39] | D'Agostini, Giovanni D'AGOSTINI ORGANIZZAZIONE SRL, Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 06829667.2 | 15.12.2006 | [2009/39] | WO2006EP12136 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071223 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2101840 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2101840 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A61M1/12 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
A61M60/148 (EP,US);
A61M60/183 (EP,US);
A61M60/196 (EP,US);
A61M60/427 (EP,US);
A61M60/508 (EP,US);
A61M60/837 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Extension states | AL | 15.07.2009 | BA | 15.07.2009 | HR | 15.07.2009 | MK | 15.07.2009 | RS | 15.07.2009 | Title | German: | PUMPE ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES HERZENS | [2013/15] | English: | CARDIOCIRCULATORY AIDING DEVICE | [2009/39] | French: | APPAREIL D'AIDE CARDIOCIRCULATOIRE | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/39] | KARDIOZIRKULATORISCHE HILFSVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2006 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | GB | 15.12.2013 | IE | 15.12.2013 | LU | 15.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
GB | 15.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
GB | 15.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3553736 (KANTROWITZ ADRIAN, et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, lines 8-40 ** figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]GB1307135 (CUTTER LAB) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, column L, lines 32-57; figures 1-4,8 * * page 3, column R, lines 72-97 * * page 4, column R, lines 76-82 * * page 4, column R, lines 119-122 * * page 5, column L, lines 15-18 *; | [Y]GB2112472 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-3,4a,4b,4c,8-12 * * page 2, lines 8-31 *; | [Y]US4846831 (SKILLIN DAVID E [US]) [Y] 7,12 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 59 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, lines 48-57 *; | [Y]US4906229 (WAMPLER RICHARD K [US]) [Y] 11 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, lines 7-57 *; | [Y]US2004242954 (CALDERON MOISES [MX], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-3,6a,6b,6c * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0026] , [0031] *; | [Y]WO2005042082 (SUNSHINE HEART CO PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 19 *; | [E]EP1745809 (A N B TECHNOLOGY S R L [IT]) [E] 1-6,9-11 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] - [0022] - [0028] - [0032] , [0034] , [0035] , [0039] * | by applicant | US3553736 | GB1307135 | GB2112472 | US4846831 | US4906229 | US2004242954 | WO2005042082 | EP1745809 |