EP1960261 - AIRCRAFT WITH MODULAR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2010/44] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFJANN, Claus Rehrstieg 142 21147 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
SCHULDZIG, Hansgeorg Westfeld 4 21635 Jork / DE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 D-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06829672.2 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP12142 | Priority number, date | DE20051060369 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005060369 | US20050750955P | 16.12.2005 Original published format: US 750955 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068499 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960261 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960261 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/00, B64F5/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B64C1/0009 (EP,US);
B64C2001/0045 (EP,US);
B64C2211/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2009/02] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGZEUG MIT MODULARER STRUKTUR | [2008/35] | English: | AIRCRAFT WITH MODULAR STRUCTURE | [2008/35] | French: | AERONEF DOTE D UNE STRUCTURE MODULAIRE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 22.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/33] | SE | 01.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2326863 (AIKEN STUART CHARLES [GB]); | [X]WO9939975 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB], et al); | [X]US2004195454 (PAGE MARK A [US], et al); | [X]US2005178912 (WHELAN DAVID A [US], et al); | [X]US2005178880 (HOWE MARK E [US]) |