EP1976767 - CONTAINER / CLOSURE PACKAGE HAVING IMPROVED SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROWN Packaging Technology, Inc. 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMAN, Galen 5115 US Highway 22NW Somerset, Ohio 43783 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, James, L 820 King Street Lancaster, Ohio 43130 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Ratliff, Ismay Hilary Crown Packaging UK PLC Group Intellectual Property Downsview Road Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB | [2008/41] | Application number, filing date | 06830672.9 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006EP69790 | Priority number, date | US20050755031P | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 755031 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007077110 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976767 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/14 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B65D51/145 (EP,US);
B65D45/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER-/VERSCHLUSS-VERPACKUNG MIT VERBESSERTER ABDICHTUNG | [2008/41] | English: | CONTAINER / CLOSURE PACKAGE HAVING IMPROVED SEAL | [2008/41] | French: | EMBALLAGE CONTENANT / FERMETURE À ÉTANCHÉITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 15.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5346082 (OCHS CHARLES S [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 *; | [AD]US5617768 (PALAZZOLO ROBERT J [US]) [AD] 1-10* abstract *; | [AD]US6228317 (SMITH MARVIN LEE [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005019059 (CROWN PACKAGING TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 11 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1,2; claim 1 * |