EP1985086 - METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING DATA IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALK, Rainer Parkstr. 43 85435 Erding / DE | 02 /
KOHLMAYER, Florian Moosbichlstr. 16 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2008/44] | Application number, filing date | 06830684.4 | 18.12.2006 | [2008/44] | WO2006EP69844 | Priority number, date | DE20061006549 | 13.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006006549 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093245 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985086 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985086 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W80/04 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/06 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/162 (EP);
H04W80/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/44] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON DATEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2008/44] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING DATA IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2008/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | AT | 18.12.2016 | IE | 18.12.2016 | LU | 18.12.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
AT | 18.12.2016 | ||
IE | 18.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.12.2016 | ||
LU | 18.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X] - FORSBERG (ED) NOKIA Y OHBA TOSHIBA B PATIL NOKIA H TSCHOFENIG SIEMENS A YEGIN SAMSUNG D, "PANA Mobility Optimizations", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20051021), vol. pana, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015042607 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - FORSBERG NOKIA J BOURNELLE GET/INT R MARIN LOPEZ UNIVERSITY OF MURCIA D, "PANA Mobility Optimizations with Session Keys Context (SKC)", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20051019), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015042185 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - BOURNELLE (ED) M LAURENT-MAKNAVICIUS GET/INT H TSCHOFENIG SIEMENS Y EL MGHAZLI ALCATEL G GIARETTA TILAB R LOPEZ UNIV OF MURCIA Y O, "Use of Context Transfer Protocol (CxTP) for PANA", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20050218), no. 2, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015037647 [X] 1-15 * page 6 - page 10 * * page 28 - page 29 * | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200512), vol. 3-SA3, no. V670, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014032879 [A] 1-15 * page 7 - page 8 * * page 18 - page 19 * * page 22 * |