EP1976533 - TRITERPENEQUINONE AND TRITERPENEPHENOL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR APPLICATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF TUMORS AND PARASITIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Universidad de la Laguna Molinos De Agua, S/n 38207 La Laguna- Santa Cruz De Tenerife / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS Calle Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | ||
For all designated states Universidad de la Laguna Molinos De Agua, S/n 38207 La Laguna- Santa Cruz De Tenerife / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACAL SANJUÁN, Juan Carlos Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | 02 /
RAMÍREZ DE MOLINA, Ana Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | 03 /
BÁÑEZ CORONEL, Mónica Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | 04 /
GUTIÉRREZ RAVELO, Ángel Edifio Central, Delgado Barreto, s/n E-38200 La Laguna, Tenerife / ES | 05 /
ESTÉVEZ BRAUN, Ana Edifio Central, Delgado Barreto, s/n E-38200 La Laguna, Tenerife / ES | 06 /
YAZMÍN MESA SIVERIO, Dulce Edifio Central, Delgado Barreto, s/n E-38200 La Laguna, Tenerife / ES | 07 /
PÉREZ SACAU, Elisa Edifio Central, Delgado Barreto, s/n E-38200 La Laguna, Tenerife / ES | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
LACAL SANJUÁN, Juan Carlos Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
RAMÍREZ DE MOLINA, Ana Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
03 /
BÁÑEZ CORONEL, Mónica Serrano, 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
04 /
GUTIÉRREZ RAVELO, Ángel Molinos De Agua, S/n 38207 La Laguna - Santa Cruz De Tenerife / ES | |||
05 /
ESTÉVEZ BRAUN, Ana Molinos De Agua, S/n 38207 La Laguna - Santa Cruz De Tenerife / ES | |||
06 /
YAZMÍN MESA SIVERIO, Dulce Molinos De Agua, S/n 38207 La Laguna - Santa Cruz De Tenerife / ES | |||
07 /
PÉREZ SACAU, Elisa Molinos De Agua, S/n 38207 La Laguna - Santa Cruz De Tenerife / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06830856.8 | 29.12.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006EP70276 | Priority number, date | ES20050003263 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: ES 200503263 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007077203 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1976533 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, C07J63/00, A61P35/00, A61P31/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/10, A61P33/00 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/216 (ES);
A61K31/56 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C49/727 (ES);
C07C49/747 (ES);
C07C69/753 (ES);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRITERPENCHINON- UND TRITERPRENPHENOL-DERIVATE UND IHRE ANWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN UND PARASITISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2008/41] | English: | TRITERPENEQUINONE AND TRITERPENEPHENOL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR APPLICATION FOR THE TREATMENT OF TUMORS AND PARASITIC DISEASES | [2008/41] | French: | DERIVES DE TRITERPENEQUINONE ET DE TRITERPENEPHENOL ET LEUR APPLICATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS ET DE MALADIES PARASITAIRES | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5650167 (ALLISON ANTHONY C [US]) [X] 1,2,7,38,39,44,70,71 * column 2, line 8 - line 49; example -; claim - *; | [DX]US2004220267 (DEVLIN J P [US]) [DX] 1,2,8,34 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4117854 (WIEMANN WOLFRAM [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,34-36 * the whole document *; | [X]US4328309 (CHALMERS WILLIAM T, et al) [X] 1,2,34 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 14 *; | CN1410434 [ ] (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]); | [X] - BAVOVADA, RAPEPOL ET AL, "Spectral assignment and cytotoxicity of 22-hydroxytingenone from Glyptopetalum sclerocarpum", PLANTA MEDICA , 56(4), 380-2 CODEN: PLMEAA; ISSN: 0032-0943, (1990), XP002430960 [X] 1-6,34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-960988 | [X] - SATTAR, E. ABDEL ET AL, "Quinone-methide triterpenes from tissue cultures of Catha edulis", SAUDI PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL , 6(3-4), 242-245 CODEN: SPJOEM; ISSN: 1319-0164, (1998), XP008078000 [X] 1-6,34 * the whole document * | [X] - SNEDEN, ALBERT T., "Isoiguesterin, a new antileukemic bisnortriterpene from Salacia madagascariensis", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS , 44(4), 503-7 CODEN: JNPRDF; ISSN: 0163-3864, (1981), XP002430961 [X] 1,2,34,38,39,70,71 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50016a023 | [X] - SETZER, WILLIAM N. ET AL, "The cytotoxic activity of a Salacia liana species from Monteverde, Costa Rica, is due to a high concentration to tingenone", PLANTA MEDICA , 64(6), 583 CODEN: PLMEAA; ISSN: 0032-0943, (1998), XP008078001 [X] 1,2,5,6,34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-957524 | [X] - NGASSAPA, OLIPA ET AL, "Quinone-methide triterpenes and salaspermic acid from Kokoona ochracea", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS , 57(1), 1-8 CODEN: JNPRDF; ISSN: 0163-3864, (1994), XP008078029 [X] 1,2,5,6,34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50103a001 | [X] - KRISHNAMOORTHY, V. ET AL, "Constitution of tingenone, a component of the stem bark of Euonymus tingens", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1963:66327, URL: STN, XP002430965 [X] 38,39,42 * abstract * | [X] - DELLE MONACHE ET AL, "STRUCTURE OF TINGENONE, A QUINONOID TRITERPENE RELATED TO PRISTIMERIN", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1973), ISSN 0300-922X, pages 2725 - 2728, XP008078016 [X] 38,39,42 * page 2727, column R, paragraph 2 * | [X] - CALZADA, F. ET AL, "Friedelanes and triterpenoid quinone methides from Hippocratea excelsa", PLANTA MEDICA , 57(2), 194-5 CODEN: PLMEAA; ISSN: 0032-0943, (1991), XP002430962 [X] 38,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-960066 | [A] - WANG, HONG ET AL, "Synthesis of a serial Pristimerin derivative with antioxidative and antitumor activities", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:809895, URL: STN, XP002430966 [A] 1-8,34,38-45,70,71 * abstract * | [X] - GONCALVES DE LIMA OSWALDO ET AL, "ANTIMICROBIAL SUBSTANCES OF HIGHER PLANTS. XXXVIII. ISOLATION AND IDENTIFICATION OF MAITENIN AND PRISTIMERIN FROM ROOTS OF PLENCKIA POLPUNEA, COLLECTED FROM WOODS NEAR THE UNIVERSITY OF BRASILIA", REVISTA DO INSTITUO DE ANTIBIOTICOS, INSTITUTO DE ANTIBIOTICOS, RECIFE, BR, (1972), vol. 12, no. 112, ISSN 0080-0228, pages 13 - 18, XP008080291 [X] 1,2,5,6,8,36,37 * abstract * * tables I,II * | [X] - GOIJMAN S G ET AL, "Effect of tingenone, a quinonoid triterpene, on growth and macromolecule biosynthesis in Trypanosoma cruzi", EXPERIENTIA, BIRKHAUSER VERLAG. BASEL, CH, (1985), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0014-4754, pages 646 - 648, XP008080343 [X] 1,2,5,6,35,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02007701 | [X] - LEE BYONG WON ET AL, "QUINONE METHIDE TRITERPENES FROM TRIPTERYGIUM REGELII", AGRICULTURAL CHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, XX, KR, (2004), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 1229-2737, pages 77 - 80, XP008078002 [X] 1-4,8,36 * the whole document * | [X] - SOTANAPHUN UTHAI ET AL, "ANTIMICROBIAL ACTIVITY AND STABILITY OF TINGENONE DERIVATIVES", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1999), vol. 65, no. 5, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 450 - 452, XP008080303 [X] 1-6,36,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-960472 | [X] - PAVANAND, KATCHRINNEE ET AL, "Schizontocidal activity of Celastrus paniculatus Willd. against Plasmodium falciparum in vitro", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH , 3(4), 136-9 CODEN: PHYREH; ISSN: 0951-418X, (1989), XP002439425 [X] 1,2,8,35,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.2650030514 | [X] - GONZALEZ A G ET AL, "A NEW BIOACTIVE NORQUINONE-METHIDE TRITERPENE FROM MAYTENUS SCUTIOIDES", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1998), vol. 64, no. 8, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 769 - 771, XP008080289 [X] 1,2,8,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-957581 | [X] - BHATNAGAR S S ET AL, "PRISTIMERIN, THE ANTIBACTERIAL PRINCIPLE OF PRISTIMERA INDICA. I. ISOLATION, TOXICITY, AND ANTIBACTERIAL ACTION", JOURNAL OF SCIENTIFIC & INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH, XX, XX, (1951), vol. 10B, pages 56 - 61, XP008080316 [X] 1,2,8,36 * the whole document * | [X] - CHOPRA I C ET AL, "IN VITRO ANTITUBERCULOUS ACTIVITY OF PRISTIMERIN", JOURNAL OF SCIENTIFIC & INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH, XX, XX, (1959), vol. C18, page 85, XP008080295 [X] 1,2,8,36 * the whole document * | [X] - GONCALVES DE LIMA, O. ET AL, "Antimicrobial substances in higher plants. XXIX. Antibiotic activity of celastrol", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1984), Database accession no. 1971:506532, URL: STN, XP002439430 [X] 1,2,8,36 * abstract * | [X] - THIEM, DEBORAH A. ET AL, "Bisnortriterpenes from Salacia madagascariensis", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS , 68(2), 251-254 CODEN: JNPRDF; ISSN: 0163-3864, (20050130), XP002439426 [X] 1,2,35-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np0497088 | [X] - FIGUEIREDO, JOAQUIM NEVES ET AL, "Novel Quinone Methides from Salacia Kraussii with in Vitro Antimalarial Activity", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS , 61(6), 718-723 CODEN: JNPRDF; ISSN: 0163-3864, (1998), XP002439427 [X] 1,2,8,35,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np9704157 | by applicant | WO9805644 | US2004220267 | - CUADRADO A. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1993), vol. 8, pages 2959 - 2968 | - JIMENEZ B. ET AL., J. CELL BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 57, pages 141 - 149 | - HERNANDEZ-ALCOCEBA, R. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 2289 - 2301 | - NAGASE, M. ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM, (2003), vol. 67, page 1883 | - RAMIREZ, A. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 937 - 946 | - GILLIES, R. J.; DIDIER, N.; DENTON, M., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 159, pages 109 - 113 |