EP1946253 - SMART CARD PRODUCING METHOD AND A SMART CARD IN PARTICULAR PROVIDED WITH A MAGNETIC ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2015/17] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 102, boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states OBERTHUR CARD SYSTEMS SA 102, boulevard Malesherbes 75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUNAY, François 13, rue des Glycines 14610 Epron / FR | 02 /
VENAMBRE, Jacques 6, avenue Jean Vilar 14123 Ifs / FR | 03 /
LIMELETTE, Yann 421 Waynebrook Drive Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US | 04 /
BARBOTIN, Aurélie 12, cours de Bilbao 35200 Rennes / FR | [2015/17] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
LAUNAY, François 13, rue des Glycines F-14610 Epron / FR | ||
02 /
VENAMBRE, Jacques 6, avenue Jean Vilar F-14123 Ifs / FR | |||
03 /
LIMELETTE, Yann 421 Waynebrook Drive US-CHESTER SPRINGS, PA 19425 / US | |||
04 /
BARBOTIN, Aurélie 12, cours de Bilbao F-35200 Rennes / FR | |||
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
LAUNAY, François 13, rue des Glycines F-14610 Epron / FR | ||
02 /
VENAMBRE, Jacques 6, avenue Jean Vilar F-14123 Ifs / FR | |||
03 /
LIMELETTE, Yann 2, rue de Vincennes F-35700 Rennes / FR | |||
04 /
BARBOTIN, Aurélie 12, cours de Bilbao F-35200 Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Bonnans, Arnaud Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée Boîte Postale 237 F-75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06831054.9 | 02.11.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006FR02450 | Priority number, date | FR20050011338 | 08.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0511338 | [2008/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054632 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946253 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946253 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/0775 (EP,US);
G06K19/07767 (EP,US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,US);
G06K19/07783 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01025 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01087 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIPKARTEN-HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND INSBESONDERE MIT EINER MAGNETANTENNE AUSGESTATTETE CHIPKARTE | [2008/30] | English: | SMART CARD PRODUCING METHOD AND A SMART CARD IN PARTICULAR PROVIDED WITH A MAGNETIC ANTENNA | [2008/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE A MICROCIRCUIT ET CARTE A MICROCIRCUIT, NOTAMMENT A ANTENNE MAGNETIQUE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2006 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | GB | 02.11.2015 | IE | 02.11.2015 | LU | 02.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/47] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
GB | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19646209 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]EP1107175 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075] * [A] 6-9,11-14; | [XA]EP0920056 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 6-14 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 4,8-11 * [A] 1-5; | [A]DE10064411 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 6-8 * column 4, line 44 - line 57 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0952542 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0083] * * figure 4 *; | [A]DE19709985 (PAV CARD GMBH [DE]) [A] 6-9 * column 12, line 64 - column 13, line 3 * * claim 33 *; | [A]EP1031939 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |