EP1952676 - ELECTRONIC ZOOM PORTABLE ELECTRIC LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEDEL Zone Industrielle de Crolles 38920 Crolles / FR | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETZL, Paul Le Fayet F-38530 Barraux / FR | 02 /
HUGUENIN, Stéphane 4 place Grenette F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
FERRAGUT, Lionel 4 chemin Barral F-38100 Grenoble / FR | 04 /
ROCOURT, Jean-Louis 461 chemin de la Veyrie F-38330 Saint Nazaire les Eymes / FR | [2008/41] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
PETZL, Paul Le Fayet F-38530 Barraux / FR | ||
02 /
HUGUENIN, Stéphane 13 rue Montorge F-38100 Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
FERRAGUT, Lionel 4 chemin Barral F-38100 Grenoble / FR | |||
04 /
ROCOURT, Jean-Louis 461 chemin de la Veyrie F-38330 Saint Nazaire les Eymes / FR | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2008/51] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Cabinet Hecké, World Trade Center - Europole, 5, place Robert Schuman, B.P. 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2008/32] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée Cabinet Hecké, World Trade Center - Europole, 5, place Robert Schuman, B.P. 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06831147.1 | 21.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006FR02555 | Priority number, date | FR20050011783 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0511783 | [2008/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060319 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1952676 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F21L4/02 (EP,US);
H05B45/30 (EP,US);
H05B45/325 (EP,US);
H05B45/357 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ELEKTROLAMPE MIT ELEKTRONISCHER ZOOMFUNKTION | [2008/32] | English: | ELECTRONIC ZOOM PORTABLE ELECTRIC LAMP | [2008/32] | French: | LAMPE ELECTRIQUE PORTATIVE A ZOOM ELECTRONIQUE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2005057929 (YANO TADASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0014] - [0021] - [0059] - [0068] - [0079] , [0091] - [0104] * * figures 9,10,12,13,21,22a,22b *; | [I]US2003174499 (BOHLANDER RICHARD A [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0020] - [0033] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2003117799 (SHIU STEPHANIE WAI MAN [HK]) [A] 1-16 * figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] *; | [A]FR2748577 (OPTICAL GAGING PROD INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |