EP1957418 - METHOD FOR SURFACE STRUCTURING OF A GLASS PRODUCT, GLASS PRODUCT WITH STRUCTURED SURFACE AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORESTI, Maud 85 rue Pasteur F-92150 Suresnes / FR | 02 /
SONDERGARD, Elin 41 rue Fontaine Grelot Bâtiment 22 F-92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | 03 /
MENEZ, Ludivine 4 quai Henri IV F-75004 Paris / FR | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Cardin, Elise Département de la Propriété Industrielle Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Cardin, Elise Département de la Propriété Industrielle Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06831335.2 | 14.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006FR51173 | Priority number, date | FR20050053576 | 23.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0553576 | [2008/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060353 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957418 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C03B13/08, C03B35/18, C03C17/25, G03F7/00 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
B29C59/046 (EP,US);
C03B13/08 (EP,KR,US);
C03B13/16 (EP,US);
C03B23/02 (EP,US);
C03B35/18 (KR);
C03C17/25 (KR);
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3607 (EP,US);
G03F7/00 (KR);
C03C2217/425 (EP,US);
C03C2217/45 (EP,US);
C03C2217/475 (EP,US);
C03C2217/77 (EP,US);
C03C2218/113 (EP,US);
C03C2218/115 (EP,US);
C03C2218/32 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENSTRUKTURIERUNG EINES GLASPRODUKTS, GLASPRODUKT MIT STRUKTURIERTER OBERFLÄCHE UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2008/34] | English: | METHOD FOR SURFACE STRUCTURING OF A GLASS PRODUCT, GLASS PRODUCT WITH STRUCTURED SURFACE AND USES | [2008/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE STRUCTURATION DE SURFACE D'UN PRODUIT VERRIER, PRODUIT VERRIER A SURFACE STRUCTUREE ET UTILISATIONS | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 21.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/36] | 12.04.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]NL1024339C (TROMPERT MICHEL NICOLAAS [NL]) [X] 1-7,10,14,24-31 * abstract * * page 3, lines 7-10,16-18 * * page 4, lines 7-10 * * page 7, lines 3-8,13-15 * [Y] 8,9,11-13,15-23; | [Y]US5231925 (ROBERTS FRANK W [US], et al) [Y] 8,9,22,23 * abstract * * column 4, lines 19-28 * * column 4, lines 5,6 *; | [Y]EP1016637 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 11-13,15-23 * pages 2,3, paragraph 7 *; | [Y]WO0010929 (PHYSICAL OPTICS CORP [US]) [Y] 22,23 * abstract * * page 7, lines 20-27 *; | [A]EP1025988 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 12 * abstract * | [A] - KRUG H ET AL, "FINE PATTERNING OF THIN SOL-GEL FILMS", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19921001), vol. 147/148, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 447 - 450, XP000398432 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(05)80656-8 | Examination | US2003044727 |