EP1937304 - ZWITTERIONIZATION OF CAPSULAR SACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TELFORD, John Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
BERTI, Francesco Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
WACK, Andreas Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06831540.7 | 24.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006IB02833 | Priority number, date | GB20050017353 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: GB 0517353 | GB20060007738 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607738 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007023386 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937304 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/09, C08B37/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61K39/095 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C08B37/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | ZWITTERIONISATION KAPSELFÖRMIGER SACCHARIDE | [2008/27] | English: | ZWITTERIONIZATION OF CAPSULAR SACCHARIDES | [2008/27] | French: | ZWITTERIONISATION DE SACCHARIDES CAPSULAIRES | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9932653 (NORTH AMERICAN VACCINE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15,18,26 * page 16, line 25 - page 18, line 14 *; | [X]WO03080678 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,8,9,14,26 * Scheme 2 * * figure 8 *; | [X]WO9640795 (NORTH AMERICAN VACCINE INC [US]) [X] 1,8,9,14,26 * page 13 *; | [XD]US6027733 (WANG YING [US], et al) [XD] 1,8,9,14,22,26 * column 5, lines 35-46; claim 3 *; | [X] - ZOU W ET AL, "Oligosaccharide fragments of the type III group B streptococcal polysaccharide derived from S. pneumoniae type 14 capsular polysaccharide by a chemoenzymatic method", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199807), vol. 309, no. 3, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 297 - 301, XP004145715 [X] 1,3-15,18,26 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(98)00134-7 | [X] - BASHAM L E ET AL, "A simple, quantitative, reproducible avidin-biotin ELISA for the evaluation of group B Streptococcus type-specific antibodies in humans", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (199604), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 439 - 445, XP004057301 [X] 1,3-9,11-14,26 * page 441 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(95)00146-R | [X] - BARTOLONI A ET AL, "Immunogenicity of meningococcal B polysaccharide conjugated to tetanus toxoid or CRM197 via adipic acid dihydrazide", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (1995), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 463 - 470, XP004057721 [X] 1,3-9,11-14,25,26 * page 464 - page 465; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)00007-A | [X] - SHEN X ET AL, "Preparation and preclinical evaluation of experimental group B streptococcus type III polysaccharide-cholera toxin B subunit conjugate vaccine for intranasal immunization", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20001122), vol. 19, no. 7-8, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 850 - 861, XP004225405 [X] 1,3-9,11-14,25,26 * page 852 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00226-7 | [AD] - TZIANABOS A O ET AL, "T cells activated by zwitterionic molecules prevent abscesses induced by pathogenic bacteria", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20000310), vol. 275, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6733 - 6740, XP002206685 [AD] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.10.6733 | [A] - TZIANABOS A ET AL, "Biological chemistry of immunomodulation by zwitterionic polysaccharides", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20031114), vol. 338, no. 23, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 2531 - 2538, XP004479525 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2003.06.005 | Examination | WO2006082530 | US2003170267 |