EP1961024 - KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purcocks, Dale McPhee 1/2 Brookfield Terrace Blackrock Dublin / IE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Strachan, Victoria Jane VJS Intellectual Property Services 134 St. Teilo Street Pontarddulais Swansea SA4 8RE / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06831683.5 | 12.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006IB03560 | Priority number, date | GB20050025605 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0525605 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007069026 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961024 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/7065, H01H5/02 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
H01H13/7065 (EP,KR,US);
H01H13/52 (GB,KR);
H01H13/14 (KR);
H01H13/70 (GB);
H01H13/705 (GB);
H01H13/86 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | TASTATUR | [2008/35] | English: | KEYBOARD | [2008/35] | French: | CLAVIER | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3681723 (GOLL FREDERICK MARTIN); | [X]US4068202 (LYONS III MICHAEL J); | [X]GB2099762 (INT COMPUTERS LTD); | [X]US5977888 (FUJITA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]EP1168234 (FUJITSU TAKAMISAWA COMPONENT [JP]); | [X]US2002075108 (WARD LESTER G [US], et al) |