EP1961002 - OPTICAL STORAGE INTERFACE APPARATUS, METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN OPTICAL STORAGE INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/26] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Juil Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Prof. Holstlaan 6, Building WAH P.O.Box 220 NL-5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06832128.0 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006IB54644 | Priority number, date | CN20051129796 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: CN200510129796 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066303 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961002 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961002 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G11B7/1387 (EP);
G11B7/085 (KR);
G11B7/08511 (EP);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE SPEICHERSCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER OPTISCHEN SPEICHERSCHNITTSTELLE | [2008/35] | English: | OPTICAL STORAGE INTERFACE APPARATUS, METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN OPTICAL STORAGE INTERFACE | [2008/35] | French: | INTERFACE DE MEMOIRE OPTIQUE, PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'UNE INTERFACE DE MEMOIRE OPTIQUE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 28.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.06.2009 | BE | 24.06.2009 | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | DK | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IT | 24.06.2009 | LT | 24.06.2009 | LV | 24.06.2009 | NL | 24.06.2009 | PL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | ES | 05.10.2009 | IS | 24.10.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | IE | 07.12.2009 | LU | 07.12.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.12.2009 | ||
LU | 07.12.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.12.2009 | ||
LU | 07.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
BE | 24.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 24.06.2009 | |
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5140576 (YAMADA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5,10,11 * column 5, line 20 - line 25; figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 51 - line 62 *; | [A]EP1262960 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,9-11 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0078]; figures 10,16 *; | [A]US2003067850 (TAKAHASHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0089]; figure 10; claim 9 *; | [A]US2005190666 (ISHIMOTO TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0052]; figures 1,8,13,14 *; | [A] - ISHIMOTO T ET AL, "Gap Servo System for a Biaxial Device Using an Optical Gap Signal in a Near Field Readout System", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO, JP, (200305), vol. 42, no. PART 1, 5A, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2719 - 2724, XP002358565 [A] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 2721 - page 2722; figures 1,3,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.42.2719 |