EP1947848 - IMAGING/REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/39] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Baiping c/o SONY DIGITAL NETWORK APPLICATIONS, INC. 21-28, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
UENO, Ichiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/39] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
LIAO, Baiping c/o SONY DIGITAL NETWORK APPLICATIONS, INC., 21-28, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
UENO, Ichiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06832429.2 | 07.11.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006JP322179 | Priority number, date | JP20050327596 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005327596 | JP20050327597 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005327597 | [2008/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007055205 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947848 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947848 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/91, H04N5/225 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N5/93 (KR);
G09B29/00 (KR);
G09B29/10 (KR);
H04N23/00 (KR);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | H04N5/91, H04N5/225, H04Q7/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] | Title | German: | ABBILDUNGS-/WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2008/30] | English: | IMAGING/REPRODUCING DEVICE | [2008/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D IMAGERIE/DE REPRODUCTION | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | Translation filed | 04.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2013 | 07.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10008475.5 / EP2249562 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003063133 (FOOTE JONATHAN T [US], et al) [X] 1-2,4-6,8-10,12-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0041] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]JP2004045651 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [X] 1-2,4-6,8-10,12-13 * abstract *; | [XI]JP2004363823 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-2,4-6,8-10,12-13 * abstract * [I] 3,7; | [XPI]EP1631083 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-2,4-6,8-10,12-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0086] - [0103] * * figures 1-16 *[I] 3,7; | [X] - "Red Hen Systems, Inc - Media Mapper", INTERNET CITATION, (20020705), URL: http://www.afds.net/mediamapper.html, (20041028), XP002304366 [X] 1-2,4-6,8-10,12-13 * the whole document * | [X] - BERRY J K ET AL, "practical applications of video mapping in Natural Resources", INTERNET CITATION, (20020704), URL: http://www.innovativegis.com/basis/misc/GIS01_VMS.htm, (20041028), XP002304367 [X] 1-2,4-6,8-10,12-13 * the whole document * |