EP1953851 - ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2-banchi, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHSAWA, Yasuhiko c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
KAWAI, Mikio c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06832446.6 | 09.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006JP322347 | Priority number, date | JP20050326746 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005326746 | JP20060274397 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006274397 | [2008/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007055267 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1953851 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, H01M4/58, H01M10/052 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/04 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (KR);
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/587 (KR);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | H01M4/02, H01M4/58, H01M10/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/34] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2008/32] | English: | ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY USING SAME | [2008/32] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE L'UTILISANT | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | Translation filed | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 11.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5744258 (BAI LIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 2-5 * * column 3, lines 4-27 * * example 3 ** claim - *; | [Y]US6159636 (WANG ENOCH I [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * figure - * * column 2, line 52 - column 6, line 5 * * column 9, line 51 - column 11, line 17 * * column 11, line 37 - column 12, line 19 * * column 12, line 66 - column 14, line 4 * * column 14, line 56 - column 15, line 8 * * column 15, line 22 - column 16, line 2 * * table 2 *; | [A]EP1174937 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0040] - [0046] - [0067] - [0073] *; | [A]US2002061443 (NAKANISHI NAOYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] - [0022] - [0026] - [0074] - [0076] * * tables 4,11 *; | [Y]JP2003197180 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * claim - * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] - [0009] - [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0027] * * figures 4,5 *; | [A] - HIDEKI KITAO ET AL, "High-Temperature Storage Performance of Li-Ion Batteries Using a Mixture of Li-Mn Spinel and Li-Ni-Co-Mn Oxide as a Positive Electrode Material", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS, (20050101), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1149/1.1843792, ISSN 1099-0062, page A87, XP055027517 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page A87, column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 10 * * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1843792 | Examination | - TOSHIKATSU TANAKA ET AL, "Year 2000 R&D status of large-scale lithium ion secondary batteries in the national project of Japan", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 97, doi:10.1016/S0378-7753(01)00502-X, ISSN 0378-7753, (20001211), pages 2 - 6, (20110215), XP028142728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(01)00502-X | - M. Stanley Whittingham, "Lithium Batteries and Cathode Materials", Chemical Reviews, (20041001), vol. 104, no. 10, doi:10.1021/cr020731c, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 4271 - 4302, XP055121431 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr020731c |