EP1955871 - PRODUCT WITH CONCAVE-CONVEX PATTERN ON ITS SURFACE AND METHOD OF FORMING THE CONCAVE-CONVEX PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanazawa Hakkosha Co., Ltd. 1-10 Nishiishikiricho 2-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Tanazawa Hakkosha Co., Ltd. 1-10 Nishiishikiricho 2-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 5798013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONESHIMA, Sadayuki 11-2, Miyanosaka 5-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0022 / JP | 02 /
SOGABE, Mitsushi 12-5, Kisabeminami 1-chome Katano-shi Osaka 576-0035 / JP | 03 /
TAMAKI, Tsuyoshi 212-1-216, Kanigaya Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0025 / JP | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06833008.3 | 21.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006JP323158 | Priority number, date | JP20050344828 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005344828 | [2008/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007063739 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955871 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/22, B32B3/30, B32B27/00, B44C1/20 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B44C1/228 (EP,US);
B44C1/22 (KR);
B32B27/00 (KR);
B32B3/30 (KR);
B44C1/1733 (EP,US);
B44C1/20 (KR);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [2009/03] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKT MIT KONKAV-KONVEXEM MUSTER AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BILDEN DES KONKAV-KONVEXEN MUSTERS | [2008/33] | English: | PRODUCT WITH CONCAVE-CONVEX PATTERN ON ITS SURFACE AND METHOD OF FORMING THE CONCAVE-CONVEX PATTERN | [2008/33] | French: | PRODUIT PRÉSENTANT UN MOTIF CONCAVO-CONVEXE SUR SA SURFACE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAÇAGE DU MOTIF CONCAVO-CONVEXE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | Translation filed | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 01.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |