EP1956665 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKANE, Takashi 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 02 /
KUMA, Hitoshi 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 03 /
FUKUOKA, Kenichi 1280, Kamiizum iSodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiroshi 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 05 /
HOSOKAWA, Chishio 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06833267.5 | 24.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006JP323463 | Priority number, date | JP20050341989 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005341989 | [2008/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007061063 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956665 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50, C09K11/06 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/15 (KR);
H10K50/16 (KR);
H10K85/631 (KR);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZBAUELEMENT | [2008/33] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE | [2008/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESENT ORGANIQUE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2008 | Translation filed | 20.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 08.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |