EP2085325 - SHEET STORING CARRIER SYSTEM AND RETICLE CASE MAKING USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miraial CO., LTD. 18-2, Nishi-Ikebukuro 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0021 / JP | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAKI, Tadao Miraial Co., Ltd. 18-2, Nishi-Ikebukuro 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0021 / JP | 02 /
UMEDA, Toshiya 19-2, Sakai 5-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-0022 / JP | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06833288.1 | 24.11.2006 | [2009/32] | WO2006JP323484 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008062537 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085325 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/86, H01L21/673, H01L21/67 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
H01L21/67353 (EP,US);
H01L21/67005 (EP,US);
H01L21/67359 (EP,US);
H01L21/67376 (EP,US);
H01L21/67393 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | B65D85/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | BLATTLAGERUNGSTRÄGERSYSTEM UND DIESES VERWENDENDES RETIKELGEHÄUSE | [2009/32] | English: | SHEET STORING CARRIER SYSTEM AND RETICLE CASE MAKING USE OF THE SAME | [2009/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE DE FEUILLES ET BOÎTIER À RÉTICULE UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | Translation filed | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 25.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4804086 (GROHROCK PETER [DE]) [Y] 9,11,13-18,20-22 * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [XA]JPH02278746 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 9,11; | [XY]EP0565001 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9,11,13-18,20-22; | [XA]US2004159573 (LIM CHANG-SU [KR], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 4 * [A] 9,11,17; | [A]US2006244942 (GREGERSON BARRY [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11,13* paragraph [0045] * |