EP1964659 - METHOD OF PRODUCING SHEET AND SHEET PRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAO, Jiro 16-A1-15, Takehana Jizojiminami-cho Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 607-8088 / JP | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06833688.2 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006JP323885 | Priority number, date | JP20050345354 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005345354 | [2008/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007063927 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964659 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/16, B29C47/92, B29L7/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B29C55/143 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/251 (EP,US);
B29C48/91 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
B29C55/08 (EP,US);
B29C55/12 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92066 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92076 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92152 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92171 (EP,US);
B29C2948/9219 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92428 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92438 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92447 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92523 (EP,US);
B29C2948/926 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92647 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92666 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92685 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92695 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92904 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92923 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FOLIEN UND FOLIENHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/36] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING SHEET AND SHEET PRODUCING DEVICE | [2008/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FEUILLE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE FEUILLES | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2008 | Translation filed | 17.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 07.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |