EP1961309 - EQUOL-CONTAINING FERMENTATION PRODUCT OF SOYBEAN EMBRYONIC AXIS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/35] | EQUAL-CONTAINING FERMENTATION PRODUCT OF SOYBEAN EMBRYONIC AXIS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2012/23] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 2-9, Kanda-Tsukasamachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Hiroyuki, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Saga Nutraceuticals Res. Inst. 5006-5, Aza Higashiyama Omagari Yoshinogari-cho Kanzaki-gun Saga 842-0195 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Takeshi c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-11-1, Karasaki Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0106 / JP | 03 /
UENO, Tomomi, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Saga Nutraceuticals Res. Inst. 5006-5, Aza Higashiyama Omagari Yoshinogari-cho Kanzaki-gun Saga 842-0195 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Toshimi, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Saga Nutraceuticals Research Inst. 5006-5, Aza Higashiyama Omagari Yoshinogari-cho Kanzaki-gun Saga 842-0195 / JP | 05 /
TADANO, Kentaro, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Saga Nutraceuticals Res. Inst. 5006-5, Aza Higashiyama Omagari Yoshinogari-cho Kanzaki-gun Saga 842-0195 / JP | 06 /
SATO, Ikutaro, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Saga Nutraceuticals Res. Inst. 5006-5, Aza Higashiyama Omagari Yoshinogari-cho Kanzaki-gun Saga 842-0195 / JP | 07 /
UCHIYAMA, Shigeto, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Saga Nutraceuticals Res. Inst. 5006-5, Aza Higashiyama Omagari Yoshinogari-cho Kanzaki-gun Saga 842-0195 / JP | 08 /
OONO, Masahiro 1029-5, Kami, Ageo-shi Saitama 3620001 / JP | 09 /
MIZUNO, Masatoshi c/o Biwako Research Institute OTSUKA FOODS CO., LTD. 1-11-1, Karasaki Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0106 / JP | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06834010.8 | 05.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006JP324255 | Priority number, date | JP20050352337 | 06.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005352337 | JP20060277934 | 11.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006277934 | [2008/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066655 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961309 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/10, A61K8/97, A23L11/00, A23L33/105 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61K8/498 (EP,KR,US);
A23L11/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K8/97 (CN);
A23L11/07 (KR);
A23L33/10 (CN,KR);
A23L33/105 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/352 (CN,KR);
A61K36/48 (CN,KR);
A61K8/9789 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,KR);
A61P13/08 (EP,KR);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP,KR);
A61P19/10 (EP,KR);
A61P25/24 (EP,KR);
A61P3/00 (EP,KR);
A61P3/04 (EP,KR);
A61P3/06 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P5/30 (EP,KR);
A61P5/32 (EP,KR);
A61P7/10 (EP,KR);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A23V2250/0636 (KR);
A23V2250/21172 (KR);
A23V2400/21 (KR);
A61K2236/19 (CN,KR);
A61K2800/85 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/21172 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5488, A23V2200/3262 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | A23L1/20, A23L1/30, A61K35/74, A61P13/08, A61P15/12, A61P19/10, A61P3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | EQUOLHALTIGES FERMENTATIONSPRODUKT DER SOJABOHNEN-EMBRYONALACHSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2017/31] | English: | EQUOL-CONTAINING FERMENTATION PRODUCT OF SOYBEAN EMBRYONIC AXIS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2012/23] | French: | PRODUIT DE FERMENTATION D'AXE EMBRYONNAIRE DE GRAINES DE SOJA CONTENANT DE L'ÉQUOL, ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DUDIT PRODUIT | [2008/35] |
Former [2008/35] | EQUALHALTIGES FERMENTATIONSPRODUKT DER SOJABOHNEN-EMBRYONALACHSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2008/35] | EQUAL-CONTAINING FERMENTATION PRODUCT OF SOYBEAN EMBRYONIC AXIS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2008 | Translation filed | 12.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP12160323.7 / EP2474237 | EP18160164.2 / EP3351258 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1054008 (NICHIMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0013] , [0018] , [0024] , [0025] , [0035] , [0037] - [0039] - [0043] , [0079] *; | [A]US2002160079 (KIM TAE-HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018] - [0020] - [0023] , [0029] , [0043] - [0050] - [0060] , [0062] , [0076] , [0077] *; | [X]WO2004009035 (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0019] , [0023] , [0048] - [0050] - [0053] , [0078] - [0080] - [0083] , [0112] , [0114] , [0118] , [0128] * * paragraphs [0137] , [0139] , [0145]; claims 18,19 *; | [X] - NAM JU KIM ET AL, "Effect of Bifidobacterium-fermented soy hypocotyls intake on the composition of human large intestinal bacteria in the elderly", FOOD SCIENCE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, KOREAN SOCIETY OF FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SEOUL, KR, (20030101), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1226-7708, pages 178 - 179, XP009124713 [X] 1,17 * the whole document * | Examination | - Mariko Uehara ET AL, "Transformation of Daidzein to Equol and Its Bioactivity", Functional Food and Health, Washington, DC, American Chemical Society, (20080919), vol. 993, pages 81 - 89, doi:10.1021/bk-2008-0993.ch008, ISBN 978-0-84-122136-9, XP055027311 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bk-2008-0993.ch008 |