EP1964918 - Protein which can serve as nucleus for polymerization of protein polymer and process for production of cells comprising said nucleus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/36] | PROTEIN WHICH CAN SERVE AS NUCLEUS FOR POLYMERIZATION OF PROTEIN POLYMER, CELL HAVING THE POLYMER INTRODUCED THEREIN, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE CELL | ||
[2011/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Institute of Medical Science 1-6, Kamikitazawa 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0057 / JP | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Institute of Medical Science (Incorporated Foundation) 1-6, Kamikitazawa 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0057 / JP | ||
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Institute of Medical Science 1-6, Kamikitazawa 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0057 / JP | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Organization for Medical Research 1-6, Kamikitazawa 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0057 / JP | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Tokyo Metropolitan Organization for Medical Research 2-8-1, Nishi-shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 163-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NONAKA, Takashi 8-27-18-504 Toshima Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0003 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Sayuri 1-2-35-603 Tsukaguchihonmachi Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0001 / JP | 03 /
MASUDA, Masami 1525-1, Mizuko Fujimi-shi, Saitama 354-0011 / JP | 04 /
HASEGAWA, Masato 3-46-36, Tamagawa Chofu-shi, Tokyo 182-0025 / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
NONAKA, Takashi 8-27-18-504 Toshima, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0003 / JP | ||
02 /
WATANABE, Sayuri 1-2-35-603 Tsukaguchihonmachi Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
MASUDA, Masami 1525-1, Mizuko Fujimi-shi, Saitama 354-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
HASEGAWA, Masato 3-46-36, Tamagawa Chofu-shi, Tokyo 182-0025 / JP | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06834541.2 | 06.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006JP324786 | Priority number, date | JP20050352486 | 06.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005352486 | [2008/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066809 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964918 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964918 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1964918 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12Q1/02 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N5/0619 (EP,US);
C12N5/0622 (EP,US);
G01N33/5058 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | C12N15/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/09, C12Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | 07.07.2008 | BA | 07.07.2008 | HR | 07.07.2008 | MK | 07.07.2008 | RS | 07.07.2008 | Title | German: | Protein mit möglicher eignung als Nukleus für die Polymerisierung eines Proteinpolymers, und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zelle mit solchem Nukleus | [2011/13] | English: | Protein which can serve as nucleus for polymerization of protein polymer and process for production of cells comprising said nucleus | [2011/13] | French: | Protéine qui peut servir de noyau pour la polymérisation de polymère de protéine, et procédé pour la production des cellules contenant ce noyau | [2011/13] |
Former [2008/36] | PROTEIN MIT MÖGLICHER EIGNUNG ALS NUKLEUS FÜR DIE POLYMERISIERUNG EINES PROTEINPOLYMERS, ZELLE MIT DEM DARIN EINGEFÜHRTEN POLYMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZELLE | ||
Former [2008/36] | PROTEIN WHICH CAN SERVE AS NUCLEUS FOR POLYMERIZATION OF PROTEIN POLYMER, CELL HAVING THE POLYMER INTRODUCED THEREIN, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE CELL | ||
Former [2008/36] | PROTEINE QUI PEUT SERVIR DE NOYAU POUR LA POLYMERISATION DE POLYMERE DE PROTEINE, CELLULE DANS LAQUELLE LE POLYMERE EST INTRODUIT, ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE LA CELLULE | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2008 | Translation filed | 07.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 01.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | HU | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | IE | 06.12.2011 | LU | 06.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
LU | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
LU | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
LU | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 06.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0213837 (LAYTON BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO0210201 (ACTIVE MOTIF [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [X] - KIRBY JANINE ET AL, "Differential gene expression in a cell culture model of SOD1-related familial motor neuron disease.", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS 15 AUG 2002, (20020815), vol. 11, no. 17, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 2061 - 2075, XP002528432 [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/11.17.2061 | [X] - SHIMURA HIDEKI ET AL, "CHIP-Hsc70 complex ubiquitinates phosphorylated tau and enhances cell survival.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 6 FEB 2004, (20040206), vol. 279, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4869 - 4876, XP002528433 [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M305838200 | [X] - PANDEY N ET AL, "The alpha-synuclein mutation E46K promotes aggregation in cultured cells", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, online, vol. 197, no. 2, ISSN 0014-4886, (20051201), pages 515 - 520, (20060201), XP024945717 [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.expneurol.2005.10.019 | [DA] - JARRETT J T ET AL, "Seeding ''one-dimensional crystallization'' of amyloid: A pathogenic mechanism in Alzheimer's disease and scrapie?", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, vol. 73, no. 6, ISSN 0092-8674, (19930618), pages 1055 - 1058, (19930618), XP023873330 [DA] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90635-4 |