EP1969192 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST ICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wachtmeister, Isa Säleby 17 455 91 Munkedal / SE | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Kjell Säleby 17 S-455 91 Munkedal / SE | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Cederbom, Hans Erik August, et al Cegumark AB Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cederbom, Hans Erik August, et al Cegumark AB Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06835965.2 | 21.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006SE50611 | Priority number, date | SE20060000016 | 03.01.2006 Original published format: SE 0600016 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007078248 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969192 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/10, E04D13/076, E04D13/08, E01D19/16 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
E04D13/076 (EP);
E04D13/10 (EP,SE);
E01D19/16 (EP);
E04D13/0762 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | E04D13/10, E04D13/076, E04D13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN EIS | [2008/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST ICE | [2008/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA GLACE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 21.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CH506680 (ANDERMATT PAUL [CH]); | [XY]US5526626 (LOUCKS HARRY [US]); | [A]US5802777 (SATO HIROKI [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2002170792 (PHELAN R SCOTT [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2001093335 ; | [A]US5205088 (MUELLER GEORGE B [US]); | [A]FR2703380 (DUBOSC ERIC [FR], et al); | [A]DE29620418U (STALLER HANS [DE]); | [A]US6725623 (RIDDELL RICHARD A [US], et al); |