EP1934823 - CLICK DISTANCE DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRIUC, Mihai One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836141.9 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US37571 | Priority number, date | US20050238906 | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 238906 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007041120 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934823 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1934823 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINER KLICK-DISTANZ | [2008/26] | English: | CLICK DISTANCE DETERMINATION | [2008/26] | French: | DETERMINATION DE DISTANCE DE CLIC | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2006 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | IT | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | IE | 25.09.2013 | LU | 25.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.09.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
PT | 25.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5920859 (LI YANHONG [US]) [A] 1-4,14-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - line 65; figures 2,6 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 55 *; | [A]US6285999 (PAGE LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1,14,15,19,20* the whole document *; | [A] - FAGIN R ET AL, "Searching the Workplace Web", WWW '03 Proceedings of the 12th international conference on World Wide Web, (20030520), pages 366 - 375, URL: http://www.almaden.ibm.com/cs/people/fagin/www03.pdf, (20060728), XP002392503 [A] 1-4,14-20 * abstract * * page 368, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 369, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 3 * * page 370, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 6; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US6185558 (BOWMAN DWAYNE [US], et al); | [A]EP1050830 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US2002103798 (ABROL MANI S [US], et al) | [Y] - FAGIN R. ET AL., "Searching the Workspace Web", WWW2003, (20030524), URL: http://www.almaden.ibm.com/cs/people/fagin/www03.pdf, XP002392503 | by applicant | - FAGIN, R. ET AL., "Searching the Workplace Web", WWW '03 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, (20030520), pages 366 - 375, URL: http://www.almaden.ibm.com/cs/people/fagin/www03.pdf |