EP1946273 - SKETCHING REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Ying-Qing One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KANG, Sing Bing One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SHUM, Heung-Yeung One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Xuejin One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06836804.2 | 01.11.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US42783 | Priority number, date | US20050732384P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732384 P | US20060554970 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: US 554970 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007053740 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946273 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00, G06T15/10, G06T15/50, G06T17/00 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
G06T15/20 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (EP,KR,US);
G06T15/02 (EP,US);
G06T15/10 (KR);
G06T15/50 (KR);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/543 (EP,US);
G06T2200/08 (EP,US);
G06T2219/2012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REALITÄTSAUFZEICHNUNG | [2008/30] | English: | SKETCHING REALITY | [2008/30] | French: | ESQUISSE DE REALITE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002032742 (SONY CORP); | [A]US6912293 (KOROBKIN CARL P [US]); | [A]US6229546 (LANCASTER J JUSTIN [US], et al); | [A]US6308144 (BRONFELD JASON P [US], et al) |