EP1957531 - BINDING POLYPEPTIDES WITH DIVERSIFIED AND CONSENSUS VH/VL HYPERVARIABLE SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENNIS, Mark 120 Plymouth Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 02 /
LIANG, Wei-Ching 840 Sea Spray Lane 112 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
WU, Yan 1160 Blythe Street Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
DENNIS, Mark 120 Plymouth Avenue San Carlos, California 94070 / US | ||
02 /
LIANG, Wei-Ching 840 Sea Spray Lane 112 Foster City, California 94404 / US | |||
03 /
WU, Yan 1160 Blythe Street Foster City, California 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06837138.4 | 07.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006US43458 | Priority number, date | US20050734092P | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 734092 P | US20060806602P | 05.07.2006 Original published format: US 806602 P | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007056441 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1957531 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957531 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/32, C07K16/00 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/005 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 05.06.2008 | BA | 05.06.2008 | HR | 05.06.2008 | MK | 05.06.2008 | RS | 05.06.2008 | Title | German: | BINDUNGSPOLYPEPTIDE MIT DIVERSIFIZIERTEN UND KONSENSUS-VH/VL-HYPERVARIABLEN SEQUENZEN | [2008/34] | English: | BINDING POLYPEPTIDES WITH DIVERSIFIED AND CONSENSUS VH/VL HYPERVARIABLE SEQUENCES | [2008/34] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE LIAISON COMPRENANT DES SEQUENCES DIVERSIFIEES ET DES SEQUENCES CONSENSUS HYPERVARIABLES VH/VL | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11161038.2 / EP2465870 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2006 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 07.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 07.11.2006 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.11.2006 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004058821 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB]; WINTER GREG [GB]; TOMLINSON IAN [GB]; IGNATOVICH OL) [X] 1-45 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004071696 (ADAMS GREGORY P [US] ET AL) [X] 1-45 * sequence 10 *; | [Y]WO2005012531 (GENENTECH INC [US]; FELLOUSE FREDERIC A [US]; SIDHU SACHDEV S [US]) [Y] 1-90 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO02061071 (LADNER ROBERT CHARLES [US] DYAX CORP [US]; LADNER ROBERT CHARLES [US]) [Y] 1-90 * the whole document *; | [DX] - LEE C V ET AL, "High-affinity Human Antibodies from Phage-displayed Synthetic Fab Libraries with a Single Framework Scaffold", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20040723), vol. 340, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1073 - 1093, XP004518119 [DX] 1-90 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.05.051 | [A] - KNAPPIK A ET AL, "Fully synthetic human combinatorial antibody libraries (HuCAL) based on modular consensus frameworks and CDRs randomized with trinucleotides", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20000211), vol. 296, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 57 - 86, XP004461525 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.3444 |