EP1951968 - System and methods for making wallboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/32] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING WALLBOARD | ||
[2011/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conboy, John S. 2235 Devonsbrook Drive Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., et al 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., et al 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2008/32] | Dennemeyer, John James, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 06837306.7 | 09.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US43757 | Priority number, date | US20050736123P | 09.11.2005 Original published format: US 736123 P | US20060345349 | 01.02.2006 Original published format: US 345349 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007056562 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951968 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951968 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/10, B28B11/14 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
B28B11/10 (EP,US);
B28B11/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | E04C2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Wandbauplatte | [2011/41] | English: | System and methods for making wallboard | [2011/41] | French: | Système et procédés de fabrication de panneaux de parement | [2011/41] |
Former [2008/32] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WANDBAUPLATTE | ||
Former [2008/32] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING WALLBOARD | ||
Former [2008/32] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PANNEAUX DE PAREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2006 | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 09.11.2012 | LU | 09.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
LU | 09.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 09.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004007162 (LAFARGE PLATRES [FR], et al) [A] 1-10,13,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004065399 (CONBOY JOHN S [US]) [A] 1,9-11,13 * the whole document * * in particular * * paragraphs [0039] - [0050] - [0052] ** figures 5-12 * | International search | [A]US4063996 (ADAMS GEORGE R, et al); | [A]US4450022 (GALER RICHARD E [US]); | [A]JPH08197348 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH1061095 (MISAWA HOMES CO); | [A]JP2002307537 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) | Examination | US5453231 |