EP1949341 - MONITOR WITH INTEGRAL INTERDIGITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RealD Inc. 100 N. Crescent Drive, Suite 120 Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US | [2011/47] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Real D 100 North Crescent Drive, Suite 120 Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPTON, Lenny 25 Corte Lodato Greenbrae, CA 94904 / US | 02 /
GREER, Josh 273 South Almont Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90211 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M29 7RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06837472.7 | 13.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006US44039 | Priority number, date | US20050736617P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 736617 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007059054 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1949341 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00, H04N13/00 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
H04N13/327 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/317 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N13/282 (EP,US);
H04N13/286 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/01] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONITOR MIT INTEGRALER VERZAHNUNG | [2008/31] | English: | MONITOR WITH INTEGRAL INTERDIGITATION | [2008/31] | French: | MONITEUR A INTERDIGITATION INTEGREE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 15.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 08.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0041026 (STREET GRAHAM S B [GB]) [Y] 14,15 * 0001-0013; 0019; 0021-0025; Fig.1 *; | [Y]EP1083757 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 14,15 * Abstract; 0033 *; | [Y]US2004061775 (MCCOY RANDALL E [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * Abstract; 0001-0015; 0034-0047 *; | [XYI]US2005122395 (LIPTON LENNY [US], et al) [X] 10,11,13 * the whole document * [Y] 14,15 [I] 12; | [ED]WO2007050973 (REAL D [US], et al) [ED] 10-12,14,15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5033822 (OOKI AKIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9421086 (STEREOGRAPHICS CORP [US]); | [A]US6366281 (LIPTON LENNY [US], et al); | [A]US6816158 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al); | [Y] - FELDMAN ET AL., "Interactive 2D to 3D Stereoscopic Image Synthesis", SPIE, (200503), vol. 5664, pages 186 - 197, XP008128155 | [Y] - LIPTON ET AL., "A new autostereoscopic display technology: The SynthaGram", SPIE, (200205), vol. 4660, pages 229 - 235, XP008021521 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.468036 | [Y] - STEREOGRAPHIC CORPORATION, "The SynthaGram Handbook", (200302), URL: http://www.inition.com/inition/pdf/stereographics_synthagram_handbook.pdf, XP008128110 |