EP1954330 - VARIABLE STIFFNESS SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed Seaston House P.O. Box 1317 Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Jan 18112 89TH PLACE NORTH Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 02 /
EIDENSCHINK, Tracee E.J. 2232 PINTO DRIVE Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06837672.2 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006US44347 | Priority number, date | US20050280120 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: US 280120 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007059212 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1954330 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954330 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61L29/14, A61L29/04, // A61B17/00, A61M25/09 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A61M25/0054 (EP,US);
A61L29/041 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00871 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0058 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0059 (US);
A61M2025/006 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L29/041, C08L39/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | A61L29/14, A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAFT MIT VARIABLER STEIFHEIT | [2008/33] | English: | VARIABLE STIFFNESS SHAFT | [2008/33] | French: | TIGE À RIGIDITÉ VARIABLE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2006 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | LU | 16.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | GB | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]US2004111044 (DAVIS CLARK C [US], et al) [DX] 1 * page 4, paragraph 51 - page 5, paragraph 52 * * page 13, paragraph 107; figures 18-20 * [Y] 2; | [YA]US5938623 (QUIACHON DIGNAH B [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 21, line 22 - column 22, line 6; claim 1 * [A] 29-37; | [A]US2005165439 (WEBER JAN [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 47 - page 3, paragraph 50 * * page 4, paragraph 53 - page 4, paragraph 60 * * page 7, paragraph 93 - page 8, paragraph 96; figures 9A,9B,22A-C,23A-B,24A-B *; | [A]WO9524236 (SCHNEIDER USA INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 8; figures 7,10-14 *; | [A]US2005102017 (MATTISON RICHARD C [US]) [A] 3-9,14-28 * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 1, paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 38; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]US2003114776 (GRIFFIN STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 12 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004054322 (VARGAS JAIME SALVADOR [US]) [A] 1-37 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 37 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - page 4, paragraph 49; figures 1,4a,4b * * page 7, paragraph 74 - page 8, paragraph 74; figure 22 * | by applicant | US2004111044 | US5938623 | US2005165439 | US2005102017 | US2003114776 | US2004054322 |