EP1960860 - SMART SOFT KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTIPALLI, Krishna, V. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06837954.4 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US44741 | Priority number, date | US20050304240 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 304240 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007070223 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960860 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/023 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/0236 (EP,US);
G06F3/02 (KR);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | G06F3/02, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE WEICHE TASTATUR | [2008/35] | English: | SMART SOFT KEYBOARD | [2008/35] | French: | CLAVIER PROGRAMMABLE INTELLIGENT | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 23.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/13] | 18.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6094197 (BUXTON WILLIAM A S [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 2-6 * | International search | [A]US5717425 (SASAKI KENJI [JP]); | [Y]US5812117 (MOON BYOUNG-SEOUP [KR]); | [A]US2002149569 (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US], et al); | [Y]US2004212590 (KOO JI-HUN [KR], et al) | Examination | WO2004017216 |