EP1971227 - HIGH-POTENCY SWEETENER COMPOSITION WITH AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENT AND COMPOSITIONS SWEETENED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY Patents One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta GA 30313 / US | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAKASH, Indra 9750 Talisman Drive Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 02 /
DUBOIS, Grant, E. 215 Quincy Lane Roswell, GA 30076 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Bittner, Thomas L., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06837996.5 | 17.11.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US44803 | Priority number, date | US20050739302P | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 739302 P | US20050739124P | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 739124 P | US20060805209P | 19.06.2006 Original published format: US 805209 P | US20060805216P | 19.06.2006 Original published format: US 805216 P | US20060556147 | 02.11.2006 Original published format: US 556147 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007061912 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1971227 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23L2/60, A61P29/00 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L27/34 (EP,US);
A23L27/36 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2250/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | SÜSSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHER SÜSSKRAFT, DIE EIN ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDES MITTEL ENTHÄLT, UND HIERMIT GESÜSSTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/39] | English: | HIGH-POTENCY SWEETENER COMPOSITION WITH AN ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENT AND COMPOSITIONS SWEETENED THEREWITH | [2008/39] | French: | COMPOSITION D'EDULCORANT TRES PUISSANT AVEC UN AGENT ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE ET COMPOSITIONS SUCREES AVEC CELLE-CI | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000290199 ; | [X]CN1089096 ; | [X]JPH0952825 ; | [X]JP2004033226 ; | [X]JPH09194370 ; | [A]US4235942 (HELLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 20,21 * [polyamino acid as food additive];; claim 9 *; | [X]US4684666 (HAAS ROBERT T [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10-12,41,45 * example 1 *; | [X]US5290605 (SHAPIRA NIVA [IL]) [X] 1,2,9,41,42,49,81,82,85 * example 1 *; | [XY]US5565435 (YONEYAMA MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10-12,14,15,41-44,48,50-52,54,55,81 * examples B-4 * [Y] 1; | [X]US6045850 (KONDOU TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-16,18,41-44,48-56,58,81-83,93 * examples 1-11 *; | CN1314085 [ ] (HAN SHANGJI [CN]); | [X]US2001048952 (SISKIND HARRY J [US]) [X] 41,42,48,50,51,54,58,59,81,82,85 * paragraph [0017] *; | [X]US2002051752 (CHIESI PAOLO [IT], et al) [X] 41,42,45,81 * example 8 *; | [X]WO02076433 (C S BIOSCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 41,42,47,48,54,55,81 * example 1 *; | KR20050007255 [ ] (CHUN HYUN CHUL, et al); | [Y]WO2005020721 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,9-13,41-44,50-53,81-83,85-87,89 * table 20 *; | [X]EP1588627 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-12,41-44,81,82,91 * example 13 *; | [PA]WO2006117029 (HUYBRECHTS LUCAS [BE]) [PA] 20,21,60,61 * [may become relevant if priority fails] *; | [X] - "Natural glucoside fruit sweetening agent and its preparation method", EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20010920), XP002456320 [X] 1,2,4,8,10-12,14,23,27-29,41,42,44,48,50-52,54,62,63,68,69,81 * column A * | [Y] - FRANKE S I R ET AL, "Influence of orange juice over the genotoxicity induced by alkylating agents: an in vivo analysis", MUTAGENESIS, IRL PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20050614), vol. 20, no. 4, ISSN 0267-8357, pages 279 - 283, XP002431470 [Y] 1-4,7,9-13,41-44,50-53,81-83,85-87,89 * page 282 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/mutage/gei034 | [Y] - SHAMALA T R ET AL, "Honey - it is more than just sweet.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 2000-00-l0214, XP002456356 [Y] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - INDIAN FOOD INDUSTRY, DEP. OF FOOD MICROBIOL., CENT. FOOD TECH. RES. INST., MYSORE 570 013, INDIA, (1999), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 349 - 357 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 15, Database accession no. 2001-141280, XP002456324 & JP2000290199 A 20001017 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7-15,18,28,31,32,41,42,45,47-55,58,68,71,72,81 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 33, Database accession no. 1995-246843, XP002456325 & CN1089096 A 19940713 (CHEN Z) [X] 41,42,48,50-52,54,55,68,69,81 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 18, Database accession no. 1997-197200, XP002456326 & JPH0952825 A 19970225 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,8,14,35-42,45,48,54,55,68,81 * abstract * | [X] - "Preparation of natural wild strawberries-infused tea by mixing dried green tea, freeze dreid strawberries and functional additives under predetermined pressure and drying", EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20050117), XP002456321 [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,14,28,29,41-43,47,48,50,51,54,55,68,69 * column A * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 20, Database accession no. 2004-207536, XP002456327 & JP2004033226 A 20040205 (TAKEDA KIRIN SHOKUHIN KK) [X] 41,42,81-83,85,87,89,90 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 40, Database accession no. 1997-431389, XP002456328 & JPH09194370 A 19970729 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8,14-17,28,41,42,47,48,50,54,68,82 * abstract * | [Y] - ABAD M J ET AL, "Anti-inflammatory activity of two flavonoids from Tanacetum microphyllum", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1993), Database accession no. PREV199396091597, XP002456322 [Y] 1,14,28 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS (LLOYDIA), (1993), vol. 56, no. 7, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 1164 - 1167 | [Y] - RAJBHANDARI A, "The flavonoids of stevia rebaudiana", J. NAT. PROD., (1983), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 194 - 195, XP002456319 [Y] 1,14,28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50026a010 | [A] - GEUNS J M C, "Stevioside", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (200311), vol. 64, no. 5, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 913 - 921, XP004463937 [A] 1-8,14,35-48,75-80 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(03)00426-6 | [A] - SCHIFFMAN S S ET AL, "Synergism among ternary mixtures of fourteen sweeteners", CHEMICAL SENSES, IRL PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (2000), vol. 25, ISSN 0379-864X, pages 131 - 140, XP002255253 [A] 1-96 * tables 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/chemse/25.2.131 | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Sweet tasting amino acid, glycine, enhances flavor and provides functional properties.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, (1983), Database accession no. 85-4-06-t0061, XP002456323 [A] 18,19 * abstract * | [ ] - FOOD PROCESSING USA, FOOD PROCESSING, USA 1983, (1983), vol. 44, no. 7, page 90 | Examination | US5962678 | US6461659 | - NAKAMOTO T ET AL, "Stevia sweetener as foodstuffs, comprises a-glucosyl stevia extract as principle component, a-mono and a-di glucosyl rebaudioside A with preset weight of a-glucosyl rebaudioside A and steviol glycoside", WPI / THOMSON, (2000), XP002462346 |