EP1962710 - APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING CATHETER ELECTRODE-TISSUE CONTACT IN ELECTRO-ANATOMIC MAPPING AND NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/36] | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING CATHETER ELECTRODE-TISSUE CONTACT IN ELECTRO-ANATOMIC MAPPING AND NAVIGATION SYSTEM | ||
[2015/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | [2015/33] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. 6500 Wedgwood Road Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-3642 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Saurav 2250 Plymouth Road, Apt. 302 Minnetonka, MN 55305 / US | 02 /
CAO, Hong 13511 Hillsboroa Avenue Savage, MN 55378 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2008/36] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06840133.0 | 06.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US61711 | Priority number, date | US20050748234P | 06.12.2005 Original published format: US 748234 P | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007067938 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962710 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962710 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, // A61B19/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00303 (US);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (US);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0075 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00755 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00869 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/053 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/36] | A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE DES KATHETERELEKTRODEN-GEWEBE-KONTAKTS IN EINEM ELEKTROANATOMISCHEN MAPPING- UND NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/15] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING CATHETER ELECTRODE-TISSUE CONTACT IN ELECTRO-ANATOMIC MAPPING AND NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2015/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'UN CONTACT ELECTRODE-TISSU DE CATHETER DANS UN SYSTEME DE CARTOGRAPHIE ELECTRO-ANATOMIQUE ET DE NAVIGATION | [2015/15] |
Former [2008/36] | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE DES KATHETERELEKTRODEN-GEWEBE-KONTAKTS IN EINEM ELEKTROANATOMISCHEN MAPPING- UND NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/36] | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING CATHETER ELECTRODE-TISSUE CONTACT IN ELECTRO-ANATOMIC MAPPING AND NAVIGATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/36] | PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE D'UN CONTACT ELECTRODE-TISSU DE CATHETER DANS UN SYSTEME DE CARTOGRAPHIE ELECTRO-ANATOMIQUE ET DE NAVIGATION | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 29.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2006 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IE | 06.12.2015 | LU | 06.12.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/37] | HU | 06.12.2006 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
IT | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5588432 (CROWLEY ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,5-8,11 * abstract * * column 26, lines 11-16 *; | [X]US5836990 (LI HONG [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 3, lines 12-23 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 22 *; | [X]US6391024 (SUN WEIMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0009] , [0094] *; | [XY]US2002068931 (WONG YEE CHIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0068] , [0080] * [Y] 10; | [XY]US6490474 (WILLIS N PARKER [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-9,11 * column 13, line 60 - column 14, line 4 * * column 20, lines 46-51; figure 1 * [Y] 10; | [XY]US2004243018 (ORGAN LESLIE WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0015] , [0056] * [Y] 10; | [X]EP1586281 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050] *; | [X] - AVITALL B ET AL, "THE EFFECTS OF ELECTRODE-TISSUE CONTACT ON RADIOFREQUENCY LESION GENERATION", PACE - PACING AND CLINICAL ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY, BLACKWELL FUTURA PUBLISHING, MALDEN, MA, US, (19971201), vol. 20, no. 12, PART 01, ISSN 0147-8389, pages 2899 - 910, XP000725263 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1540-8159.1997.tb05458.x | International search | [Y]US5673704 (MARCHLINSKI FRANCIS E [US], et al); | [Y]US6171304 (NETHERLY SAMUEL G [US], et al); | [X]US6490474 (WILLIS N PARKER [US], et al); | [A] - HONG ET AL., "Using Electrical Impedance to Predict Catheter-Endocardial Contact During RF Cardiac Ablation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 49, no. 3, (200203), pages 247 - 253, URL: http://www.ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpl/freeabs_all.jsp?tp=&arnumber=983459&isnumber=21200, XP008127923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/10.983459 | by applicant | US6490474 |