EP1960197 - DOCTOR FOR A PRINTING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolf Meyer GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 17 22941 Bargteheide / DE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖRTE, Thomas Westpreussenstrasse 21 22941 Bargteheide / DE | 02 /
BEDNARCZYK, Siegfried Helenenweg 2 21509 Glinde / DE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Bosch, Matthias Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06840970.5 | 13.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP12006 | Priority number, date | DE20052019482U | 13.12.2005 Original published format: DE 202005019482 U | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068468 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960197 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1960197 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41F5/24, B41F7/32, B41F15/42, B41F15/44, B41F31/04, B41F31/20 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B05C1/0817 (EP,US);
B41F31/027 (EP,US);
B41F9/1072 (EP,US);
B05C1/0813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAKEL FÜR EINE DRUCKMASCHINE | [2008/35] | English: | DOCTOR FOR A PRINTING PRESS | [2008/35] | French: | RACLOIR POUR MACHINE D'IMPRESSION | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 23.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | DK | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | FI | 22.04.2009 | IE | 22.04.2009 | LT | 22.04.2009 | LV | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | PL | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | IS | 22.08.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | AT | 13.12.2009 | LU | 13.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
AT | 13.12.2009 | ||
LU | 13.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
LU | 13.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 22.04.2009 | |
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 22.04.2009 | |
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE2110299 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [DA] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]FR2707918 (CHEVREUX PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002117107 (KANEKO MITSURU [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |