EP1976619 - METHOD FOR THE ELIMINATION OF METAL COMPLEX CATALYSTS FROM TELOMERIZATION MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Oxeno GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGARTEN, Goetz Reinhard-Freericks-Str. 20 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 02 /
ORTMANN, Dagmara Grundbielstrasse 11 CH-3902 Brig-Glis / CH | 03 /
KUPPINGER, Franz-Felix Rudolf-Virchow-Str. 37a 45768 Marl / DE | 04 /
BORGMANN, Cornelia Kurfürstenstr. 49 60486 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
HOUBRECHTS, Stephan Zandstraat 7 B-2570 Duffel / BE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/06] | Application number, filing date | 06841288.1 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006EP69401 | Priority number, date | DE20061003618 | 26.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006003618 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007085321 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976619 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1976619 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/02, C08F2/38, C07C41/06, C07C67/04 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B01D61/027 (EP,US);
B01D61/02 (KR);
B01J31/1608 (EP,US);
B01J31/1845 (EP,US);
B01J31/2273 (EP,US);
B01J31/2291 (EP,US);
B01J31/4015 (EP,US);
B01J31/4038 (EP,US);
B01J31/4061 (EP,US);
C07C209/84 (EP,US);
C07C41/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07C41/36 (EP,US);
C07C43/15 (EP,US);
C07C67/04 (KR);
C07C67/293 (EP,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F6/02 (EP,US);
B01J2531/80 (EP,US);
B01J2531/824 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/84, C07C211/21 (US,EP);
C07C41/06, C07C43/15 (US,EP);
C07C41/36, C07C43/15 (US,EP);
C07C67/293, C07C69/007 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON METALL-KOMPLEXKATALYSATOREN AUS TELOMERISATIONSGEMISCHEN | [2008/41] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ELIMINATION OF METAL COMPLEX CATALYSTS FROM TELOMERIZATION MIXTURES | [2008/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE CATALYSEURS RENFERMANT UN COMPLEXE MÉTALLIQUE À PARTIR DE MÉLANGES DE TÉLOMÉRISATION | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2006 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IE | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5243099 (PACKETT DIANE L [US]) [X] 1,10,11,15-18 * column 4, line 41 - line 49 * * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 15 *; | [X]US5302750 (LIVINGSTON JOEL R [US]) [X] 1,3,10,11,15,16,18 * column 1, line 5 - line 11 * * claims 8-13 *; | [I]EP1103303 (DSM NV [NL]) [I] 1-7,10,11,16,17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0019] - [0024] - [0030] - [0040] , [0045]; example - *; | [I]WO03053572 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-5,7,8,10,11,19,20 * page 21, line 28 - page 22, line 14 * * page 27, line 36 - page 30, line 41 ** page 24, line 17 - line 40 *; | [PXL]WO2006024616 (OXENO OLEFINCHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [PXL] 1,10,11,15-18 * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 9 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 2; figure 1 * |