EP1973930 - CYCLIC PEPTIDES AND THEIR USE IN TREATING ADVANCED STAGE NEUROBLASTOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DKFZ Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states DKFZ Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts, Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states DKFZ Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts, Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITT, Olaf Mannheimer Strasse 8 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 02 /
DEUBZER, Hedwig Elisabeth Steckelsgasse 21 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
WESTERMANN, Frank Im Frauenpfad 19 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 04 /
ROENNDAHL, Gabi Rodenbecker Str. 42 32427 Minden / DE | 05 /
HEINRICH, Ralf Pfaffenstueck 3 37077 Göttingen / DE | 06 /
EHEMANN, Volker Hans-thoma-strasse 23 69129 Waldorf / DE | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
WITT, Olaf Mannheimer Strasse 8 69198 Schriesheim / DE | ||
02 /
DEUBZER, Hedwig Elisabeth Steckelsgasse 21 69121 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
WESTERMANN, Frank Im Frauenpfad 19 69221 Dossenheim / DE | |||
04 /
ROENNDAHL, Gabi Gertrudstrasse 5 32427 Minden / DE | |||
05 /
HEINRICH, Ralf Pfaffenstueck 3 37077 Göttingen / DE | |||
06 /
EHEMANN, Volker Hans-thoma-strasse 23 69129 Waldorf / DE | Representative(s) | Dick, Alexander Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstraße 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Dick, Alexander Herzog Fiesser & Partner Bad Kreuznacher Straße 27 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Huhn, Michael, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06841383.0 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006EP69776 | Priority number, date | EP20050028301 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: EP 05028301 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007071625 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1973930 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/12, A61K31/00, A61P35/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C07K5/126 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CYCLISCHE PEPTIDE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROBLASTOM IM FORTGESCHRITTENEN STADIUM | [2008/40] | English: | CYCLIC PEPTIDES AND THEIR USE IN TREATING ADVANCED STAGE NEUROBLASTOMA | [2008/40] | French: | PEPTIDES CYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE NEUROBLASTOME AU STADE AVANCÉ | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/02] | 04.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2010 | 06.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP09178496.7 / EP2194061 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1174438 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-13 * figure 2; claims 1,9 *; | [X]EP1010705 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-13 * claims 1,9 *; | [X]WO03057722 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-13 * claims 1,19 * | [X] - HESS-STUMPP H, "Histone deacetylase inhibitors and cancer: from cell biology to the clinic", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, WISSENSCHAFLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, STUTTGART,, DE, (20050309), vol. 84, no. 2-3, ISSN 0171-9335, pages 109 - 121, XP004954663 [X] 1,2,7-13 * page 115 - page 116; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejcb.2004.12.010 |