EP1966577 - PRESSURE-MEASURING CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser GmbH+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THAM, Anh Tuan Rüdersdorfer Strasse 45 10243 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BURCZYK, Dietfried Iserstrasse 92 14513 Teltow / DE | 03 /
STOLZE, Dieter Wildapfelweg 8 14469 Potsdam / DE | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06841597.5 | 22.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006EP70169 | Priority number, date | DE20051063213 | 31.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005063213 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007077168 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1966577 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1966577 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/06 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G01L9/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | DRUCKMESSZELLE | [2008/37] | English: | PRESSURE-MEASURING CELL | [2008/37] | French: | CELLULE DE MESURE DE PRESSION | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 22.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2006 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | IT | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | PL | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | AT | 22.12.2012 | GB | 22.12.2012 | IE | 22.12.2012 | LU | 22.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.12.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
LU | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.12.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
PL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 25.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004083110 (MICROGAN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,13-16 * page 22 - page 24; figure 3; claim 9 *; | [A]US2002066319 (BEACH ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004083110 |